EP0696426 - Process for preparing a texture forming agent for milk products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.1996 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.1996 | Change - withdrawal | published on 17.04.1996 [1996/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1996/07] | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 CH-1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bisson, Jean-Pierre 9, Rue des Tanneurs F-14000 Caen / FR | 02 /
Prella, Giovanni Via Don Cesare, Martinetti 12 I-13100 Vercelli / IT | [1996/07] | Representative(s) | Archambault, Jean, et al 55, avenue Nestlé 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1996/07] | Archambault, Jean, et al 55, avenue Nestlé CH-1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 94112683.1 | 13.08.1994 | [1996/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0696426 | Date: | 14.02.1996 | [1996/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A23C9/15, A23C9/13, A23C19/05, A23J1/20 | [1996/07] | CPC: |
A23C19/053 (EP,US);
A23C9/1232 (EP,US);
A23C9/1307 (EP,US);
A23C9/1512 (EP,US);
A23J1/207 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1996/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Texturgebendendem Mittels für Milchprodukte | [1996/07] | English: | Process for preparing a texture forming agent for milk products | [1996/07] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un agent de texture pour produits laitiers | [1996/07] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 16.02.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2160479 (STICHTING BEDRIJVEN VAN HET) [A] 1,2,5,7 * example 1; claims 1-5 *; | [A]EP0250623 (LABATT LTD JOHN [CA]) [A] 1* page 12 - page 16; claims 1,14-20 *; | [A]EP0283101 (DMV CAMPINA BV [NL]) [A] 1 * example 1; claims 1-5 *; | [Y]EP0515246 (UNIV MONTPELLIER II [FR]) [Y] 1,3,4,7-10 * page 2, line 36 - page 5, line 12; claims 1,10-14 *; | [Y]EP0520581 (FRIESLAND FRICO DOMO COOP [NL]) [Y] 1,3,4,7-10 * page 1, line 28 - page 2, line 24; example 1; claims 1-12 * | [A] - F. BRAY, "Tecnologica per il gelato senza grasso", INDUSTRIE ALIMENTARI, (1991), vol. XXX, no. 2, pages 117 - 119 [A] 1,2 * page 118 * | [A] - J. KAMMERLEHNER, "Simplesse 100- Dry Simplesse 100", DMZ LEBENSMITTELINDUSTRIE UND MILCHWIRTSCHAFT, (1993), vol. 114, no. 29, pages 848 - 852 [A] 1-10 * page 848 - page 849 * |