EP0630013 - Tape loading device of magnetic recording/reproducing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
Former [1994/51] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Konishi, Akio 46-4-102, Yamadaikehigashi-machi Hirakata-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Yoshio, Hideaki 41, Hokuto-cho Moriguchi-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Makabe, Toshio 4-7-7, Yata, Higashisumiyoshi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 04 /
Hirabayashi, Koichiro 1-6-14, Shariji, Ikuno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 05 /
Saito, Yoshiyuki Kureru Shirohato 509, 514-6, Oaza Kamishimagashira Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | [1994/51] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/51] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 94112747.4 | 11.10.1990 | [1994/51] | Priority number, date | JP19890267321 | 13.10.1989 Original published format: JP 26732189 | JP19890267322 | 13.10.1989 Original published format: JP 26732289 | JP19890267323 | 13.10.1989 Original published format: JP 26732389 | JP19890267324 | 13.10.1989 Original published format: JP 26732489 | JP19890267325 | 13.10.1989 Original published format: JP 26732589 | JP19890267329 | 13.10.1989 Original published format: JP 26732989 | [1994/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0630013 | Date: | 21.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0630013 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | [1997/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0630013 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G11B15/665 | [1994/51] | CPC: |
G11B15/6656 (EP,US);
G11B15/6653 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/51] | Title | German: | Bandladevorrichtung von Magnetaufzeichnungs-/Wiedergabegerät | [1994/51] | English: | Tape loading device of magnetic recording/reproducing apparatus | [1994/51] | French: | Dispositif de chargement de bande d'appareil d'enregistrement/reproduction de bande | [1994/51] | Examination procedure | 16.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/51] | 04.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP90119500.8 / EP0422642 | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS61188768 ; | [A]JPS61137254 ; | [A]JPS61230656 ; | [A]JPS60209957 ; | [A]JPS6449155 ; | [A]EP0083932 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 7, line 13 - page 11, line 5; figure - *; | [DA]US4561029 (MAEDA MASAYA [JP]) [DA] 1 * column 11, line 45 - column 14, line 43; figure - *; | [DA]US4692823 (GWON SEONG T [KR]) [DA] 1 * column 3, line 63 - column 8, line 20; figure - *; | [A]EP0240925 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]) [A] 1* abstract *; | US4928191 [ ] (KAKU NOBUYUKI [JP], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870116), vol. 011, no. 015, Database accession no. (P - 536), & JP61188768 A 19860822 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861113), vol. 010, no. 334, Database accession no. (P - 515), & JP61137254 A 19860624 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870228), vol. 011, no. 068, Database accession no. (P - 553), & JP61230656 A 19861014 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860322), vol. 010, no. 072, Database accession no. (P - 438), & JP60209957 A 19851022 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890612), vol. 013, no. 250, Database accession no. (P - 882), & JP01049155 A 19890223 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |