EP0647842 - Procedure and apparatus for leak detection of a container, especially of a plastic bottle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.1998 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.04.1998 [1998/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELPATRONIC AG Industriestrasse 35 8962 Bergdietikon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | For all designated states ELPATRONIC AG Hertizentrum 6 CH-6303 Zug / CH | ||
Former [1995/15] | For all designated states ELPATRONIC AG Baarerstrasse 112 CH-6300 Zug / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gernet, Pierre Rebbergstrasse 13 CH-5400 Ennetbaden / CH | 02 /
Jungo, Daniel Flühacherstrasse 2 CH-8116 Würenlos / CH | 03 /
Ubezio, Stefan Wolfsmattstrasse 1 CH-8953 Dietikon / CH | [1995/15] | Application number, filing date | 94112757.3 | 16.08.1994 | [1995/15] | Priority number, date | CH19930003039 | 08.10.1993 Original published format: CH 303993 | CH19940000346 | 07.02.1994 Original published format: CH 34694 | [1995/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0647842 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01M3/32 | [1995/15] | CPC: |
G01M3/3254 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, LI, NL, SE [1995/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erkennung eines Lecks in einem Behälter, insbesondere einer Kunststoff-Flasche | [1995/15] | English: | Procedure and apparatus for leak detection of a container, especially of a plastic bottle | [1995/15] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la détection de fuite d'un récipient en particulier d'une bouteille en matière plastique | [1995/15] | Examination procedure | 14.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/15] | 07.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE2016076 (COSMOPOLITAN ASSURANCE CO LTD.) [X] 1-3,5 * page 7, paragraph L - page 9, paragraph 2; figures 1-3 * [Y] 7,8,10; | [Y]US4942758 (COFIELD) [Y] 7,8 * column 4, line 13 - column 5, line 31; figures 1,3 *; | [Y]US3390569 (J. H. MCMEEKIN) [Y] 10 * column 3, paragraph 4; figure . * |