EP0639851 - Highly durable noncontaminating surround materials for plasma etching [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.1998 [1998/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IPEC Precision, Inc. 3 Berkshire Boulevard Bethel, CT 06801 / US | [1997/46] |
Former [1995/08] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bollinger, Lynn David 122 Firehill Road Ridgefield, CT 06877 / US | 02 /
Power, Michael P. 25 Parmalee Hill Newtown, CT 06470 / US | 03 /
Poole, Richard R. Bliarwood Road Norwalk, CT 06850 / US | 04 /
Gardopee, George J. 116 Bridle Path Southbury, CT 06488 / US | [1995/08] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/08] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 94112778.9 | 16.08.1994 | [1995/08] | Priority number, date | US19930110021 | 20.08.1993 Original published format: US 110021 | [1995/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0639851 | Date: | 22.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32, H01L21/00 | [1995/08] | CPC: |
H01L21/68 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1995/08] | Title | German: | Nicht kontaminierenden Umgebungmaterialien hoher Beständigkeit für das Plasma-Ätzen | [1995/08] | English: | Highly durable noncontaminating surround materials for plasma etching | [1995/08] | French: | Matériaux d'environnement de haute longévité et non contaminants pour la gravure par plasma | [1995/08] | Examination procedure | 14.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/41] | 15.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/19] | 08.12.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US4612077 (TRACY DAVID H [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,7,9 * column 2, line 48 - line 68; figure - * [A] 8; | [Y]EP0115970 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [Y] 1,2,7,9 * page 3, line 6 - line 21 * * page 5, line 7 - page 6, line 28; figure - *; | [A]JPH04191379 ; | [A]JPH0499282 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921022), vol. 16, no. 512, Database accession no. (C - 998), & JP04191379 A 19920709 (APURAIDO MATERIARUZU JIYAPAN K.K.) [A] 1,3,8,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920722), vol. 16, no. 338, Database accession no. (C - 965), & JP04099282 A 19920331 (NIPPON LIGHT METAL CO LTD.) [A] 1,8,9 * abstract * |