Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0638997
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
13.11.1998 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.12.1998 [1998/53] |
21.11.1997 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] |
26.09.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.08.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.06.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
28.06.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.02.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
31.01.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.10.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.10.1996 |
First examination report |
|
20.08.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.12.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] |
30.12.1994 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] |