EP0628889 - Toner mixing in magnetic brush developement apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.1998 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 07.10.1998 [1998/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peer, Larry W. c/o Eastman Kodak Co., Patent Dep., 343 State Str. Rochester, New York 14650 -2201 / US | 02 /
Westbrook, Susan P. c/o Eastman Kodak Co., Patent Dep., 343 State Str. Rochester, New York 14650 -2201 / US | 03 /
Olan, Christopher J. c/o Eastman Kodak Co., Patent Dep., 343 State Str. Rochester, New York 14650 -2201 / US | 04 /
Weitzel, Richard A. c/o Eastman Kodak Co., Patent Dep., 343 State Str. Rochester, New York 14650 -2201 / US | 05 /
Armstrong, Timothy G., c/o Eastman Kodak Co. Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1995/27] |
Former [1994/50] | 01 /
Speer, Larry W. c/o Eastman Kodak Co., Patent Dep., 343 State Str. Rochester, New York 14650 -2201 / US | ||
02 /
Westbrook, Susan P. c/o Eastman Kodak Co., Patent Dep., 343 State Str. Rochester, New York 14650 -2201 / US | |||
03 /
Olan, Christopher J. c/o Eastman Kodak Co., Patent Dep., 343 State Str. Rochester, New York 14650 -2201 / US | |||
04 /
Weitzel, Richard A. c/o Eastman Kodak Co., Patent Dep., 343 State Str. Rochester, New York 14650 -2201 / US | Representative(s) | Blickle, K. Werner, et al KODAK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Patentabteilung 70323 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | Blickle, K. Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al KODAK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Patentabteilung D-70323 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 94113291.2 | 26.11.1990 | [1994/50] | Priority number, date | US19890444209 | 01.12.1989 Original published format: US 444209 | US19890444210 | 01.12.1989 Original published format: US 444210 | US19890444256 | 01.12.1989 Original published format: US 444256 | US19890444257 | 01.12.1989 Original published format: US 444257 | US19890444258 | 01.12.1989 Original published format: US 444258 | [1994/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0628889 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0628889 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/08 | [1994/50] | CPC: |
G03G15/0896 (EP);
G03G15/0822 (EP);
G03G15/0877 (EP);
G03G15/09 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1997/11] |
Former [1994/50] | DE, FR, GB, NL | Title | German: | Tonermischer für Magnetbürstentwicklungsgerät | [1994/50] | English: | Toner mixing in magnetic brush developement apparatus | [1994/50] | French: | Mélangeur de toner pour appareil de développement à brosse magnétique | [1994/50] | Examination procedure | 20.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/29] | 04.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP91900454.9 / EP0456800 | Opposition(s) | 13.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 25.08.1994 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.02.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 26.11.1997 | [1998/41] | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4671207 (HILBERT) [DA] 1 * column 3, line 11 - column 4, line 47; figure 1 *; | [A]US4707107 (JOSEPH) [A] 1,2 * column 4, line 1 - line 21; figure 1 *; | [A]US4792831 (TAKEDA ET AL.) [A] 1 * column A; figures 1-4 *; | [A]JPS584164 ; | [A]JPS57115576 | [A] - "Monitoring Developer Mixture", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, HAVANT GB, (198911), no. 307, pages 813 - 817 [A] 1 * page 813, column 1, paragraph 3 * * page 814, column 1, paragraph 4 - paragraph 6; figure 5 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830329), vol. 7, no. 75, Database accession no. (P - 187)<1220> , & JP58004164 A 19830111 (KONISHIROKU SHASHIN KOGYO K.K.) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821021), vol. 6, no. 209, Database accession no. (P - 150)<1087> , & JP57115576 A 19820719 (CANON K.K.) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |