EP0647562 - Machine for packaging cigarettes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co. KG) Siemensstrasse 10 27283 Verden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/15] | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co.) Siemensstrasse 10 D-27283 Verden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Focke, Heinz Moorstrasse 64 D-27283 Verden / DE | 02 /
Schlenker, Michael Alma-Rogge-Weg 10 D-27283 Verden / DE | [1995/15] | Representative(s) | Bolte, Erich, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Bolte, Erich, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [1995/15] | Bolte, Erich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Patentanwälte Hollerallee 73 D-28209 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 94113473.6 | 30.08.1994 | [1995/15] | Priority number, date | DE19934334745 | 12.10.1993 Original published format: DE 4334745 | [1995/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0647562 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0647562 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B65B51/02, B65B19/22, B65B59/04 | [1995/15] | CPC: |
B65B59/04 (EP,US);
B65B19/228 (EP,US);
B65B51/023 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1798 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1995/15] | Title | German: | Verpackungsmaschine für Zigaretten-Packungen | [1995/15] | English: | Machine for packaging cigarettes | [1995/15] | French: | Machine pour emballer des cigarettes | [1995/15] | Examination procedure | 05.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/35] | 07.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DPX]EP0601411 (FOCKE & CO [DE]) [DPX] 1,7-9 * column 4, line 41 - column 6, line 7; figure - *; | [A]US3274971 (BEERT CARL J) [A] 1,2,6,8 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 40; figure - *; | [A]US3183887 (DERDERIAN EDWARD J) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 60; figure - *; | [A]EP0275887 (FOCKE & CO [DE]) |