EP0699501 - Clamping device to clamp tools [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2001 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 28.02.2001 [2001/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baur, Manfred Innovative Spanntechnik, Riedheimer Strasse 10 D-89129 Langenau / DE | [1996/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/10] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [1996/10] | Weitzel, Wolfgang, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwalt Friedenstrasse 10 D-89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 94113503.0 | 30.08.1994 | [1996/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0699501 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0699501 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q3/00, B23B31/117, B23B31/02, B23C5/26 | [1996/10] | CPC: |
B23B31/1077 (EP);
B23B31/4073 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, GB, IT, LI [1996/10] | Title | German: | Spannvorrichtung zum Einspannen eines Werkzeuges | [1996/10] | English: | Clamping device to clamp tools | [1996/10] | French: | Dispositif de serrage à serrer les outils | [1996/10] | Examination procedure | 13.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/37] | 12.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1996 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.01.1997 | 31.08.1998 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   10.02.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 31.08.1999 | LI | 31.08.1999 | GB | 09.09.1999 | [2001/09] |
Former [2000/52] | CH | 31.08.1999 | |
LI | 31.08.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0433925 (ALBERT SCHREM WERKZEUGFABRIK GMBH) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2264628 (ALBERT SCHREM KG) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]CH502158 (ALBERT SCHREM) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2084913 (MAAG GEAR-WHEEL & AMCHINE COMPANY LTD.) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]AU407776B (THE SHEFFIELD TWIST DRILL & STEEL COMPANY LTD.) [A] 1 * page 5, line 5 - line 12; figure . *; | [A]EP0093884 (WERKZEUGMASCHINENFABRIK OERLIKON-BÜHRLE AG) |