EP0644507 - Manufacturing method and device for a chip-card module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/12] | Manufacturing method and device for a chip-card module, chip-card modules and chip-card | ||
[2002/28] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2010 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gemplus GmbH Mercedesstrasse 13 70794 Filderstadt / DE | [2002/19] |
Former [1998/47] | For all designated states ODS Landis & Gyr GmbH & Co. KG Ludwig-Erhard-Strasse 16 85375 Neufahrn / DE | ||
Former [1995/12] | For all designated states ODS, R. OLDENBOURG DATENSYSTEME GmbH Rosenheimer Strasse 145 D-81660 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Frank-Thomas Dipl.-Chem. Nordstr. 16 D-99891 Fischbach / DE | 02 /
Koch, Volker Dipl.-Ing. Saurasen 1 D-99843 Thal / DE | 03 /
Trittel, Jens Dipl.-Ing. Wolfgang 35 D-99817 Eisenach / DE | [1995/12] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/12] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94113533.7 | 30.08.1994 | [1995/12] | Priority number, date | DE19930014355U | 22.09.1993 Original published format: DE 9314355 U | [1995/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0644507 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0644507 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077 | [1995/12] | CPC: |
G06K19/07745 (EP);
G06K19/07747 (EP);
H01L23/49855 (EP);
H01L2224/48091 (EP);
H01L2224/48465 (EP);
H01L2224/73265 (EP)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1995/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen eines Chipkarten-Moduls | [2002/28] | English: | Manufacturing method and device for a chip-card module | [2002/28] | French: | Méthode et procédé de fabrication de modules pour carte à puce | [2002/28] |
Former [1995/12] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen eines Chipkarten-Moduls, Chipkarten-Modul und Chipkarte | ||
Former [1995/12] | Manufacturing method and device for a chip-card module, chip-card modules and chip-card | ||
Former [1995/12] | Méthode et procédé de fabrication de modules pour carte à puce, module pour carte à puce et carte à puce | Examination procedure | 03.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/22] | 29.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.07.2004
15.03.2007
WITHDRAWN LANG, Johannes European Patent Attorney Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE Opponent's representative Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.07.2004
15.03.2007
WITHDRAWN Johannes Lang Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE Opponent's representative Lang, Johannes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenberg Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.07.2004
Johannes Lang Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE Opponent's representative Lang, Johannes, Dipl.- Ing. Patentanwälte, Bardehle Papenberg Dost Altenberg Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | 02.09.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.02.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 22.04.2010 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2010/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 29.10.2003 | CH | 31.08.2004 | LI | 31.08.2004 | [2008/05] |
Former [2005/25] | CH | 31.08.2004 | |
LI | 31.08.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [DXA]EP0211360 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [DX] 1-5,7,8,21,29 * column 10, line 47 - line 58 * * column 31, line 31 - line 39 * * claims 2,6,10,17 * * figure 1A * [DA] 9; | [DX]US4962415 (YAMAMOTO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [DX] 1,21 * claim 1 *; | [DA]EP0469970 (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR]) [DA] 1,21 * the whole document *; | [DA]GB2081950 (PHILIPS NV) [DA] 1-5,21-24,26,28,29 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0449691 (SCHLUMBERGER IND SA [FR]) [DA] 6 * figure 2 *; | [A]EP0201952 (R T C COMPELEC SOCIETE ANONYME [FR], et al) [A] 9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0132183 (SLIGOS [FR]) [A] 9 * the whole document * |