EP0629434 - Process for making a microfiltration, ultrafiltration, pervaporation or reverse osmosis membrane for suspensions, emulsions or gas separation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.1995 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.01.1996 [1996/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Altenburger Electronic GmbH Postfach 40 D-77956 Seelbach / DE | [1994/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siegfried, Hans-Günther Langenhard 17 D-77933 Lahr / DE | [1994/51] | Representative(s) | Eder, Eugen Patentanwälte Eder & Schieschke Elisabethstrasse 34 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/51] | Eder, Eugen, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. E. Eder Dipl.-Ing. K. Schieschke Elisabethstrasse 34 D-80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94113628.5 | 20.12.1990 | [1994/51] | Priority number, date | DE19904001654 | 21.01.1990 Original published format: DE 4001654 | DE19904022738 | 17.07.1990 Original published format: DE 4022738 | [1994/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0629434 | Date: | 21.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B01D67/00, B01D69/00, B01D29/48, B01D69/14, B01D37/02 | [1994/51] | CPC: |
B01D69/141 (EP,US);
B01D29/11 (EP,US);
B01D29/48 (EP);
B01D37/02 (EP,US);
B01D39/10 (EP,US);
B01D69/04 (EP,US);
B01D69/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B01D29/11, B01D29/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1994/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Membran zur Mikrofiltration, Ultrafiltration, Pervaporation oder Umkehrosmose von Suspensionen, Emulsionen oder zur Gastrennung | [1994/51] | English: | Process for making a microfiltration, ultrafiltration, pervaporation or reverse osmosis membrane for suspensions, emulsions or gas separation | [1994/51] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une membrane de microfiltration, d'ultrafiltration, de pervaporation ou d'osmose inverse de suspensions, d'émulsions ou de séparation de gaz | [1994/51] | File destroyed: | 12.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 01.07.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/01] | 28.07.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1996/01] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP90124938.3 / EP0446471 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS58180211 ; | [A]FR864853 ; | [DA]GB926138 (THOMAS GEORGE BRUNSMAN); | [A]US3367787 (THIJSSEN HENRICUS ALEXIS CORNE [NL], et al); | [A]US3577339 (BAIRD JUSTUS N JR, et al); | [DA]DE3522725 (ALTENBURGER ELECTRONIC GMBH [DE]); | [DA]EP0213941 (PARKMAN GROUP SERVIC LTD [GB]); | [DA]US4693835 (ARAI KOICHI [JP]) |