Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0629434 | Global Dossier | 21.12.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4001654 | 21.01.1990 | DE4022738 | 17.07.1990 | EP90124938 | 20.12.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4001654 | 21.03.1991 | C1 | Priority number | Date | DE4001654 | 21.01.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0655263B | Global Dossier | 27.07.1994 | B2 | JPH04215825 | 06.08.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4001654 | 21.01.1990 | DE4022738 | 17.07.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0446471 | Global Dossier | 15.03.1995 | B1 | EP0446471 | 18.09.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4001654 | 21.01.1990 | DE4022738 | 17.07.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE119803T | 15.04.1995 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE4001654 | 21.01.1990 | DE4022738 | 17.07.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4022738 | 30.07.1992 | C2 | DE4022738 | 25.07.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4001654 | 21.01.1990 | DE4022738 | 17.07.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59008725D1 | 20.04.1995 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE4001654 | 21.01.1990 | DE4022738 | 17.07.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5102539 | 07.04.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4001654 | 21.01.1990 | DE4022738 | 17.07.1990 | Type | Earlier application | EP0446471 |