EP0648925 - Exhaust gas recirculation control system for internal combustion engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/16] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimizu, Daisuke, c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd. No. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Miyashita, Kotaro, c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd. No. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Hara, Yoshihisa, c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd. No. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 04 /
Ikeba, Hiroshi, c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd. No. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [1995/16] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/16] | KOHLER SCHMID + PARTNER Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 D-70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 94113654.1 | 01.09.1994 | [1995/16] | Priority number, date | JP19930284368 | 19.10.1993 Original published format: JP 28436893 | [1995/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0648925 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0648925 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F02D43/00, F02D41/14 | [1995/16] | CPC: |
F02D41/005 (EP,US);
F02B2275/18 (EP,US);
F02D41/0077 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1995/16] | Title | German: | Abgasrückführungs-Regeleinrichtung für Brennkraftmaschinen | [1995/16] | English: | Exhaust gas recirculation control system for internal combustion engines | [1995/16] | French: | Système pour la commande du réglage des gaz d'échappement destiné à des moteurs à combustion interne | [1995/16] | Examination procedure | 05.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/27] | 07.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4445489 (KOBAYASHI KAZUO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,5; | [Y]US5241943 (MIYASHITA YUKIO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,5; | [Y]US4448177 (HASEGAWA SHUMPEI [JP], et al) [Y] 2,5; | [A]US5209214 (IKUTA KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1 |