EP0642148 - Etching process and method of manufacturing a color selecting mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/10] | Etching process, color selecting mechanism and method of manufacturing the same | ||
[1998/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.12.1999 [1999/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/10] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tago, Koichi c/o Sony Corp., 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Takei, Shinzo c/o Sony Corp., 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Shiina, Sumito c/o Sony Corp., 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1995/10] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frithjof E. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/10] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94113677.2 | 01.09.1994 | [1995/10] | Priority number, date | JP19930246250 | 07.09.1993 Original published format: JP 24625093 | JP19940013937 | 12.01.1994 Original published format: JP 1393794 | [1995/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0642148 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0642148 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0642148 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01J9/14, C23F1/00 | [1995/10] | CPC: |
H01J9/142 (EP,US);
H01J9/20 (KR);
C23F1/02 (EP,US);
H01J29/076 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1995/10] | Title | German: | Ätzverfahren und Herstellungsverfahren einer Farbwahlvorrichtung | [1998/50] | English: | Etching process and method of manufacturing a color selecting mechanism | [1998/50] | French: | Procédé de gravure et procédé de fabrication d'un dispositif de sélection de couleurs | [1998/50] |
Former [1995/10] | Ätzverfahren, Farbwahlvorrichtung und deren Herstellungsverfahren | ||
Former [1995/10] | Etching process, color selecting mechanism and method of manufacturing the same | ||
Former [1995/10] | Procédé de gravure, dispositif de sélection de couleurs et procédé de fabrication | Examination procedure | 27.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/09] | 04.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP97117418.0 / EP0821386 | Opposition(s) | 10.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0521721 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [X] 7 * figure 2 3F; claim 11 * [A] 1; | [X]EP0042496 (BUCKBEE MEARS CO [US]) [X] 7 * figure - *; | [A]JPS54152960 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800126), vol. 004, no. 011, Database accession no. (E - 168), & JP54152960 A 19791201 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 8 * abstract * | Examination | EP0641009 |