blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0641699

EP0641699 - Pneumatic braking installation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.11.2001
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.01.2002  [2002/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Motzener Strasse 25 Grundstücks GmbH & Co. Besitz KG
Motzener Strasse 25
D-12277 Berlin / DE
[1995/20]
Former [1995/10]For all designated states
Grundstücks GmbH & Co. Besitz KG
Motzener Strasse 25
D-12277 Berlin / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Inozemtsev, Vladimir, Prof.
Projezd Schakalskogo 57/2 W.189
RF-129224 MOskau / RU
[1995/20]
Former [1995/10]01 / Inozemtsey, Vladimir, Prof.
Projezd Schakalskogo 57/2 W.189
RF-129224 MOskau / RU
Representative(s)Beetz & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Prinzregentenstraße 54
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/10]Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date94113688.901.09.1994
[1995/10]
Priority number, dateDE1993432948101.09.1993         Original published format: DE 4329481
[1995/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0641699
Date:08.03.1995
Language:DE
[1995/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0641699
Date:27.08.1997
[1997/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0641699
Date:03.01.2001
Language:DE
[2001/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.07.1997
ClassificationIPC:B60T13/40
[1995/10]
CPC:
B60T15/52 (EP); B60T15/48 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FR [2000/35]
Former [1995/10]AT,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IT,  LI,  SE 
TitleGerman:Pneumatische Bremseinrichtung[1995/10]
English:Pneumatic braking installation[1995/10]
French:Installation pneumatique de freinage[1995/10]
Examination procedure16.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/16]
20.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.03.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2000Fee for grant paid
20.06.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.10.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2002/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
29.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
29.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE701963  (KNORR BREMSE AG) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2172452  (WESTINGHOUSE FREINS & SIGNAUX [FR]) [A] 1* page 13, line 6 - page 16, line 29; figures 1-3 *;
 [AD]DE2702855  (KNORR BREMSE GMBH) [AD] 1;
 [AD]CH623001  (OERLIKON BUEHRLE AG [CH]) [AD] 1 * page 4, column R, line 40 - page 5, column R, line 5; figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.