EP0645311 - Printing machine for strip-type labels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Esselte Meto International GmbH Westerwaldstrasse 3-13 64636 Heppenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | For all designated states ESSELTE METO INTERNATIONAL GmbH Westerwaldstrasse 3-13 D-64636 Heppenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Umbach, Dirk Rheinstrasse 48 D-45525 Hattingen / DE | [1995/13] | Application number, filing date | 94113779.6 | 02.09.1994 | [1995/13] | Priority number, date | DE19934332610 | 24.09.1993 Original published format: DE 4332610 | [1995/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0645311 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0645311 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B65C11/02, B65C11/00 | [1995/13] | CPC: |
B65C11/006 (EP);
B65C11/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/13] | Title | German: | Druckmaschine mit bandförmigem Aufzeichnungsträger | [1995/13] | English: | Printing machine for strip-type labels | [1995/13] | French: | Machine d'impression d'étiquettes en forme de bande | [1995/13] | Examination procedure | 03.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/26] | 18.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 27.12.1996 | IT | 27.12.1996 | [2008/05] |
Former [1999/42] | GB | 27.12.1996 | |
IT | 27.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/42] | GB | 27.12.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0453583 (TOKYO ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 13 - line 40 *; | [A]US4813571 (SLAGTER MICHAEL G [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE9307993U (DAUM ELECTRONIC GMBH) [A] 1 * figure .; claim 1 * |