EP0641955 - Cylindrical elastic mount containing highly viscous fluid and having fluid-injecting inlet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.1998 [1998/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKAI RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. 3600, Aza-Utazu Oaza-Kitatoyama Komaki-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/10] | For all designated states TOKAI RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. 3600, Aza-Utazu Oaza-Kitatoyama Komaki-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanda, Ryouji, c/o Tokai Rubber Industries Ltd. 3600 Aza-Utazu, Oaza-Kitatoyama Komaki-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1995/10] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/10] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94113789.5 | 02.09.1994 | [1995/10] | Priority number, date | JP19930219761 | 03.09.1993 Original published format: JP 21976193 | [1995/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0641955 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0641955 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F16F13/14 | [1995/10] | CPC: |
F16F13/14 (EP,US);
B60G2204/41042 (EP,US);
B60G2204/42 (EP,US);
B60G2204/45 (EP,US);
Y10S261/89 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/10] | Title | German: | Elastisches, zylindrisches Lager, das eine hochviskose Flüssigkeit enthält und einen Einlass zum Einspritzen dieser Flüssigkeit hat | [1995/10] | English: | Cylindrical elastic mount containing highly viscous fluid and having fluid-injecting inlet | [1995/10] | French: | Support élastique cylindrique contenant du fluide très visqueux et ayant une entrée pour l'injection de fluide | [1995/10] | Examination procedure | 02.09.1994 | Examination requested [1995/10] | 02.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0392909 (CAOUTCHOUC MANUF PLASTIQUE [FR]) [A] 1 * column 9, paragraph 4; figures 2,4 *; | [A]DE3831284 (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3,6-11 * column 10, line 8 - line 24; figures 1,2 *; | [A]JPH03134335 ; | [A]JPH0338729 ; | [A]JPS60256637 ; | [A]JPS63149442 ; | [A]JPS63130944 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910903), vol. 15, no. 346, Database accession no. (M - 1153), & JP03134335 A 19910607 (KINUGAWA RUBBER IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900423), vol. 14, no. 198, Database accession no. (M - 965)<4141> , & JP03038729 A 19900208 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860514), vol. 10, no. 130, Database accession no. (M - 478)<2187> , & JP60256637 A 19851218 (KURASHIKI KAKOU KK) [A] 4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881028), vol. 12, no. 409, Database accession no. (M - 758)<3256> , & JP63149442 A 19880622 (KINUGAWA RUBBER IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881011), vol. 12, no. 378, Database accession no. (M - 751)<3225> , & JP63130944 A 19880603 (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD) [A] * abstract * |