EP0643473 - Device for a collectorless dc motor commutated with a semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Papst-Motoren GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 1435 78106 St Georgen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | For all designated states PAPST-MOTOREN GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 1435 78106 St Georgen / DE | ||
Former [1995/11] | For all designated states PAPST-MOTOREN GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 1435 D-78106 St Georgen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karwath, Arno Grosshofenstr. 10 D-78628 Rottweil / DE | [1995/11] | Application number, filing date | 94114067.5 | 08.09.1994 | [1995/11] | Priority number, date | DE19930013948U | 15.09.1993 Original published format: DE 9313948 U | [1995/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0643473 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0643473 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H02P6/00, H02P6/08, H02H7/08 | [1995/11] | CPC: |
H02P29/026 (EP,US);
H02H7/0838 (EP,US);
H02P6/085 (EP,US);
H02P6/34 (EP,US);
H02P2201/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/11] | Title | German: | Anordnung mit einem über eine Halbleiteranordnung kommutierten kollektorlosen Gleichstrommotor | [1995/11] | English: | Device for a collectorless dc motor commutated with a semiconductor device | [1995/11] | French: | Dispositif pour un moteur à courant continu sans collecteur commuté par un dispositif semi-conducteur | [1995/11] | Examination procedure | 27.09.1994 | Examination requested [1995/11] | 17.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1997 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   18.11.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 29.04.1998 | [2002/26] | Documents cited: | Search | [DYA]DE9204811U (PAPST-MOTOREN GMBH) [DY] 1 * the whole document * [A] 14,18; | [YA]DE3145248 (PAPST MOTOREN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1 * figure 3; claim 1 * [A] 14,15; | [Y]US4588933 (SUN KOUSHUN [US]) [Y] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE2842145 (METABOWERKE KG) [A] 1 * figure 3 *; | [A]DE2538835 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [DA]US3873897 (MULLER ROLF) [DA] 1,17 * column A; figure 1 *; | [DA]EP0467085 (PAPST MOTOREN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract * |