EP0645108 - Sitting and/or sleeping furniture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.06.1998 [1998/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Steinhoff GmbH & Co. Handelsbeteiligungs KG Langebrügger Strasse 5 D-26655 Westerstede / DE | [1995/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kruse, Gerd Kiefernweg 16 D-26345 Bockkhorn / DE | [1995/13] | Representative(s) | Hanewinkel, Lorenz Patentanwalt Ferrariweg 17a 33102 Paderborn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | Hanewinkel, Lorenz, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt Ferrariweg 17a D-33102 Paderborn / DE | Application number, filing date | 94114079.0 | 08.09.1994 | [1995/13] | Priority number, date | DE19934332695 | 25.09.1993 Original published format: DE 4332695 | [1995/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0645108 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0645108 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | [1996/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A47C17/02, A47C7/44 | [1996/16] | CPC: |
A47C17/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/13] | A47C17/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/13] | Title | German: | Sitz- und/oder Liegemöbel | [1995/13] | English: | Sitting and/or sleeping furniture | [1995/13] | French: | Siège et/ou couchage | [1995/13] | Examination procedure | 03.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/23] | 18.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/26] | 28.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1997 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1110369 (FLINT) [A] 1 * page 1, line 87 - page 2, line 110; figures 1,2 *; | [A]NL7808740 (JAN VENKER) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 * |