EP0654876 - Birefrigence-compensated alignment-insensitive frequency doubler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.11.1999 [1999/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW INC. One Space Park, Bldg. E1/4021 Redondo Beach California 90278 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/21] | For all designated states TRW INC. One Space Park, Bldg. E1/4021 Redondo Beach, California 90278 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heflinger, Lee O. 5001 Paseo de Pablo Torrance, California 90505 / US | 02 /
Simmons, William W. 4181 Maritime Road Rancho Palos Verdes, California 90274 / US | 03 /
St. Pierre, Randall J. 928 Sixth Street, Apt. 2 Santa Monica, California 90403 / US | 04 /
Injeyan, Hagop (NMI) 1950 Fern Lane Glendale, California 91208 / US | [1995/21] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Steffen J., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/21] | Schmidt, Steffen J., Dipl.-Ing., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94114220.0 | 09.09.1994 | [1995/21] | Priority number, date | US19930152647 | 12.11.1993 Original published format: US 152647 | [1995/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0654876 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0654876 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/109, G02F1/37 | [1995/21] | CPC: |
G02F1/37 (EP,US);
H01S3/109 (EP,US);
H01S3/10076 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/21] | Title | German: | Ausrichtungsunempfindlicher Frequenzverdoppler mit Doppelbrechnungskompensation | [1995/21] | English: | Birefrigence-compensated alignment-insensitive frequency doubler | [1995/21] | French: | Doubleur de fréquence insensible à l'alignement avec compensation de biréfringence | [1995/21] | Examination procedure | 20.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/03] | 18.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4617666 (LIU KUO-CHING [US]) [Y] 1-11 * column 4, line 18 - line 51 * * column 5, line 3 - line 22 *; | [Y]US5247389 (BEAUSOLEIL RAYMOND G [US]) [Y] 1-11 * column 4, line 18 - line 51 * * column 5, line 3 - line 22 *; | [A]JPH0395982 | [X] - R.WU, "High-efficiency and compact blue source: intracavity frequency tripling by using LBO and BBO without the influence of birefringence", APPLIED OPTICS., NEW YORK US, (19930220), vol. 32, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1364/AO.32.000971, pages 971 - 975, XP002018700 [X] 1,8 * paragraph [000B]; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.32.000971 | [Y] - OSA PROCEEDINGS ON ADVANCED SOLID-STATE LASERS VOL.13. PROCEEDINGS OF THE TOPICAL MEETING, SANTA FE, NM, USA, 17-19 FEB. 1992, 1992, WASHINGTON, DC, USA, OPT.SOC.AMERICA.USA, PAGE(S) 366 - 368 [Y] 3-7,10,11 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910716), vol. 15, no. 280, Database accession no. (E - 1090), & JP03095982 A 19910422 (BROTHER IND LTD) [A] 1,8 * abstract * |