EP0701028 - Sanitary armature [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.04.1999 [1999/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KWC AG Hauptstrasse 130 CH-5726 Unterkulm / CH | [1996/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simotti, Vittore Hammer 1 CH-5000 Aarau / CH | 02 /
Brunner, Arthur Sonnenrain 195 CH-8916 Jonen / CH | [1996/11] | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1996/11] | Patentanwälte Schaad, Balass & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach CH-8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 94114281.2 | 12.09.1994 | [1996/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0701028 | Date: | 13.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0701028 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/04, E03C1/05, F16K11/20 | [1996/11] | CPC: |
E03C1/057 (EP,US);
E03C1/0401 (EP,US);
F16K11/207 (EP,US);
G01S13/04 (EP,US);
G01S13/88 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7504 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87692 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1996/25] |
Former [1996/11] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sanitäre Armatur | [1996/11] | English: | Sanitary armature | [1996/11] | French: | Armature sanitaire | [1996/11] | Examination procedure | 13.09.1995 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, DK, ES, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 20.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/34] | 21.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.10.1995 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.1995 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.1995 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.1995 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.1995 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.1995 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.1995 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.1995 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.1995 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.1995 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.1995 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4681141 (WANG WEN-CHING [TW]) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 62 - column 3, line 65; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]EP0432440 (KARRER WEBER & CIE AG [CH]) [AD] 1 * column 2, line 51 - column 4, line 19; figure 1 *; | [AD]EP0432553 (KARRER WEBER & CIE AG [CH]); | [AD]EP0455998 (KARRER WEBER & CIE AG [CH]); | [A]EP0577164 (TELMA GUZZINI S R L [IT]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 1 - column 2, line 55; figure 1 * |