EP0644061 - Antistatic subbing layer for slipping layer in dye-donor element used in thermal dye transfer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.11.1999 [1999/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/12] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bauer, Charles Leo, c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Vanier, Noel Rawle, c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1995/12] | Representative(s) | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/21] | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [1995/12] | Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94114439.6 | 14.09.1994 | [1995/12] | Priority number, date | US19930125451 | 22.09.1993 Original published format: US 125451 | [1995/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0644061 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0644061 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | [1997/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0644061 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/40 | [1995/12] | CPC: |
B41M5/44 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10S428/914 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31855 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/12] | Title | German: | Antistatische Haftschicht für die Gleitschicht eines bei der thermischen Farbstoffübertragung verwendeten Farbstoff-Donor-Elementes | [1995/12] | English: | Antistatic subbing layer for slipping layer in dye-donor element used in thermal dye transfer | [1995/12] | French: | Couche de substratage antistatique pour une couche de glissement dans un élément utilisé pour le transfert de colorant par la chaleur | [1995/12] | Examination procedure | 26.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/48] | 15.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4753921 (HENZEL RICHARD P [US]) [AD] 1-10 * column 2, line 3 - line 25 * * examples 1-4; claims 1-6,12-14,17-20 *; | [A]US4727057 (HARRISON DANIEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 13 * * examples 1-4; claims 1-20 * |