EP0654813 - Electron beam drawing apparatus and method of drawing with such an apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/21] | Electron beam drawing apparatus and method of drawing with such apparatus | ||
[1998/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/21] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moriizumi, Koichi, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Ultra LSI Kaihatsu, Kenkyusho, 1 Mizuhara 4-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664 / JP | 02 /
Kamiyama, Kinya, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Ultra LSI Kaihatsu, Kenkyusho, 1 Mizuhara 4-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664 / JP | 03 /
Taoka, Hironobu, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Ultra LSI Kaihatsu, Kenkyusho, 1 Mizuhara 4-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664 / JP | [1995/21] | Representative(s) | Prüfer, Lutz H., et al Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/21] | Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys., et al Harthauser Strasse 25d D-81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94114545.0 | 15.09.1994 | [1995/21] | Priority number, date | JP19930270992 | 28.10.1993 Original published format: JP 27099293 | [1995/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0654813 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0654813 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/20, H01J37/317 | [1995/21] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP);
B82Y40/00 (EP);
H01J37/20 (EP);
H01J37/3174 (EP);
H01L21/027 (KR);
H01J2237/20214 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/21] | Title | German: | Gerät zur Musteraufzeichnung mittels Elektronenstrahl und Mustersaufzeichnungsverfahren unter Verwendung eines solchen Geräts | [1995/21] | English: | Electron beam drawing apparatus and method of drawing with such an apparatus | [1998/20] | French: | Appareil de traçage de motifs par faisceau d'électrons et méthode de traçage de motifs utilisant un tel appareil | [1998/20] |
Former [1995/21] | Electron beam drawing apparatus and method of drawing with such apparatus | ||
Former [1995/21] | Appareil de traçage de motifs par faisceau d'électrons et méthode de traçage de motifs utilisant un tèl appareil | Examination procedure | 12.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/28] | 18.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 11.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 10.03.1999 | [2006/14] |
Former [2000/24] | FR | 06.08.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS6167914 ; | [Y]US4516029 (TUCKER THEODORE W [US]) [Y] 2,3,5 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 17 * * figure 8 *; | [YA]US5175435 (SAKAMOTO KIICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 5 * column 4, line 19 - line 58 * * column 6, line 24 - line 39 * * figures 1,3 * [A] 1,8; | [A]JPS63209127 ; | [A]JPS6167912 ; | [A]US4627009 (HOLMES DUANE C [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 12 * * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 51 * * column 4, line 26 - line 42 * * column 5, line 31 - line 41 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0422655 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3 * column 4, line 33 - column 5, line 25 * * column 8, line 31 - line 39 * * figures 3A,5 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860815), vol. 10, no. 236, Database accession no. (E - 428), & JP61067914 A 19860408 (SONY) [X] 1,6 * abstract * [Y] 2,3,5 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881224), vol. 12, no. 498, Database accession no. (E - 698), & JP63209127 A 19880830 (NEC CO.) [A] 4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860815), vol. 10, no. 236, Database accession no. (E - 428), & JP61067912 A 19860408 (SONY) [A] 5 * abstract * | Examination | - Y. SAKITANI ET AL., "Electron-beam cell-projection lithography system", J. VAC. SCI. TECHNOL., vol. B10, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1116/1.585997, pages 2759 - 2763, XP000332480 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.585997 | - "Microwave Engineering", A.N. BROERS AND T.H.P. CHANG, HIGH RESOLUTION LITHOGRAPHY, Fig. 18, Cambridge University Press, 1979, edited by H. Armed and T.H.P. Chang. | - R. YOSHIKAWA ET AL., "A high dose and high accuracy variable shaped electron beam exposure system for quartermicron device fabrication", J. VAC. SCI. TECHNOL., vol. B5, no. 1, pages 70 - 74 |