EP0698545 - Double-deck carriage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.1998 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACKERMANN-FRUEHAUF GmbH Hüttenstrasse 80 D-50170 Kerpen-Sindorf / DE | [1996/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Franz, Carl Kiebitzweg 7 D-42111 Wuppertal / DE | [1996/09] | Representative(s) | Alber, Norbert, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Alber, Norbert, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/09] | Alber, Norbert, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hansmann, Vogeser, Dr. Boecker, Alber, Dr. Strych, Liedl Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 D-81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94114624.3 | 16.09.1994 | [1996/09] | Priority number, date | DE19940013332U | 18.08.1994 Original published format: DE 9413332 U | [1996/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0698545 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B62D33/04, B60P7/135 | [1996/09] | CPC: |
B60P7/135 (EP);
B62D33/042 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, NL [1996/09] | Title | German: | Doppelstockwagen | [1996/09] | English: | Double-deck carriage | [1996/09] | French: | Chariot à deux étages | [1996/09] | Examination procedure | 05.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/36] | 01.04.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/39] | 30.04.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1998/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1997 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1828629 (S.E. TRAVIS) [A] 1 * page 3, lines 20-34; figure 4 *; | [A]US1900778 (W.S. TATUM) [A] 1 * page 3, lines 51-60; figures 2,4 *; | [A]EP0005960 (BKL EXTRUSIONS) [A] 1 * figure 3 *; | [A]DE9305610U (ANCRA JUNGFALK) [A] 1 * figures 1-11 * |