EP0645622 - DNA base sequencer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.1999 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.05.1999 [1999/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HITACHI ELECTRONICS ENGINEERING CO., LTD. 6-2 Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | For all designated states HITACHI ELECTRONICS ENGINEERING CO., LTD. 6-2 Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nemoto, Ryozi 450-97. Kitabori Honzyo-shi, Saitama-ken 367 / JP | 02 /
Mishina, Yoshinori 1086, Kamisatomachi Kami Kodama-gun, Saitama-ken 369-03 / JP | [1995/13] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94114626.8 | 16.09.1994 | [1995/13] | Priority number, date | JP19930264320 | 28.09.1993 Original published format: JP 26432093 | [1995/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0645622 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0645622 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/447 | [1995/13] | CPC: |
G01N27/44782 (EP,US);
G01N27/44721 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1995/13] | Title | German: | DNA-Basen-Analysegerät | [1995/13] | English: | DNA base sequencer | [1995/13] | French: | Analyseur des bases de l'ADN | [1995/13] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/35] | 22.03.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0504943 (HITACHI SOFTWARE ENG [JP]) [A] 1,3-5 * column 3, line 40 - column 20, line 43; figure 19 *; | [A]DE3812899 (HEIL WILFRIED [DE]) [A] 1,3-5 * column 1, line 18 - line 21 *; | [A]DE4011730 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO8707719 (EUROP LAB MOLEKULARBIOLOG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claims 1,13,16,18,21 *; | [A] - A. J. KOSTICHKA ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, NEW YORK US, vol. 10, no. 1, pages 78 - 81, XP000257039 [A] 1,3-5 * page 78 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0192-78 | [AP] - A. E. BRUNO ET AL., TRAC, TRENDS IN ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, AMSTERDAM NL, vol. 13, no. 5, pages 190 - 198, XP000439608 [AP] 1 * page 192, column R, line 28 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-9936(94)85038-0 |