EP0702502 - Programming adaptor for hearing aids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.1996 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.01.1997 [1997/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASCOM AUDIOSYS AG Bernstrasse 41 CH-3175 Flamatt / CH | [1996/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grégoire, Iten Finkenweg 6 CH-3186 Düdingen / CH | [1996/12] | Representative(s) | Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Patentanwälte Postfach 8032 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1996/12] | Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Patentanwälte, Siewerdtstrasse 95, Postfach CH-8050 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 94114671.4 | 17.09.1994 | [1996/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0702502 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/02 | [1996/12] | CPC: |
H04R25/556 (EP,US);
H04R25/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, SE [1996/12] | Title | German: | Programmieradapter für Hörgeräte | [1996/12] | English: | Programming adaptor for hearing aids | [1996/12] | French: | Interface de programmation pour prothèses auditives | [1996/12] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 18.11.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.10.1996 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0341902 (DIAPHON DEV AB [SE]) [X] 1-3 * page 3, column 4, line 9 - page 4, column 5, line 30; figure - *; | [XA]CH669296 (GFELLER AG APPARATE FABRIK FLA) [X] 1-3 * figure -; claim - * * page 3, column L, line 22 - line 34 * [A] 4; | [X]CH673551 (GFELLER AG APPARATE FABRIK FLA) [X] 1-3 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0303143 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-4 * figure -; claim - * |