EP0644619 - Method and apparatus for double securing a terminal within a connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.11.2000 [2000/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/12] | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring System, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aoyama, Masahiko, c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie-ken / JP | [1995/12] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/40] | R.A. KUHNEN & P.A. WACKER Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [1995/12] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 94114715.9 | 19.09.1994 | [1995/12] | Priority number, date | JP19930257652 | 20.09.1993 Original published format: JP 25765293 | [1995/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0644619 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0644619 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | [1997/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0644619 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/436 | [1995/12] | CPC: |
H01R13/4362 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1995/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum doppeltem Sichern eines Anschlusses in einem Verbinder | [1995/12] | English: | Method and apparatus for double securing a terminal within a connector | [1995/12] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour verrouillage double d'un terminal dans un connecteur | [1995/12] | Examination procedure | 13.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/15] | 30.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3828872 (YAZAKI CORP [JP]) [A] 7,12,14 * column 5, line 13 - line 17; figures 1-10 *; | [X]GB2218272 (AMP INC [US]) [X] 1,3,4 * page 1 - page 10; figures 1-8 *; | [A]DE8910905U (KABELWERKE REINSHAGEN) [A] 1,3 * page 1 - page 2; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US5066252 (KATO TETSUO [JP], et al) [X] 7 * column 5, line 23 - line 25 * * column 6, line 14 - line 16; figures 1-9 *; | [A]DE4114931 (YAZAKI CORP [JP]) [A] 7,12,14 * column 4, line 3 - line 31; figures 1-9 *; | [A]GB2248350 (AMP INC [US]) [A] 7-9,15* page 4, line 5 - page 7; figures 1-5 *; | [X]EP0511649 (YAZAKI CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3,4 * column 4, line 36 - column 9, line 15; figures 1-10 *; | [X]GB2255864 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [X] 1,3,4 * page 9, paragraph L - page 18; figures 1-11 *; | [PX]EP0606903 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [PX] 1,3,4 * column 3, line 4 - column 7, line 26; figures 1-9 * |