EP0644106 - Containing structure for vehicle lock device in motor-bicycle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/12] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saito, Naoyuki K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Tetsuo K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama / JP | 03 /
Showji, Yorikata K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama / JP | 04 /
Funabashi, Katsunori K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama / JP | 05 /
Dazai, Masayuki K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama / JP | 06 /
Sumitani, Shinji K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama / JP | [1995/12] | Representative(s) | Liska, Horst, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Liska, Horst, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/16] | Liska, Horst, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K.Fincke F.A.Weickmann, B.Huber Dr. H.Liska, Dr. J.Prechtel, Dr. B.Böhm, Dr. W.Weiss, Dr. M.Herzog Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/12] | Fincke, Karl Theodor, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94114809.0 | 20.09.1994 | [1995/12] | Priority number, date | JP19930261653 | 22.09.1993 Original published format: JP 26165393 | [1995/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0644106 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0644106 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B62H5/00, B62J11/00, B62K19/40 | [1995/12] | CPC: |
B62K19/40 (EP,US);
B62H5/00 (EP,US);
B62H2005/008 (EP,US);
Y10S224/935 (EP,US);
Y10T70/5872 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1995/12] | Title | German: | Behälterstruktur für Fahrzeugschlossgerät in einem Motorfahrrad | [1995/12] | English: | Containing structure for vehicle lock device in motor-bicycle | [1995/12] | French: | Structure contenant un dispositif de verrouillage dans une moto | [1995/12] | Examination procedure | 27.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/21] | 05.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0492742 (DOPPENBERG GERRIT [NL]) [X] 1 * column 6, line 53 - column 7, line 18 * * column 5, line 30 - line 57; figures 2,5,6 *; | [A]GB155626 (RICHARD DASHWOOD) [A] 1 * figure -; claims 1,4 *; | [A]EP0079798 (KBL CORP [US]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [AD]JPS58126270 (KBL CORP) [AD] 1 |