EP0645774 - Memory protection circuit for EPROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2000 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.2000 [2000/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukushima, Kiyoshi c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shina 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1995/13] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | Betten & Resch Reichenbachstrasse 19 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94114821.5 | 20.09.1994 | [1995/13] | Priority number, date | JP19930255298 | 20.09.1993 Original published format: JP 25529893 | [1995/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0645774 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0645774 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0645774 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G11C16/06 | [1995/13] | CPC: |
G11C16/22 (EP,US);
G11C7/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/13] | Title | German: | Speicherschutzschaltung für EPROM | [1998/27] | English: | Memory protection circuit for EPROM | [1995/13] | French: | Circuit de protection pour mémoire EPROM | [1995/13] |
Former [1995/13] | Speicherschützschaltung für EPROM | Examination procedure | 20.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/16] | 26.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS62236053 ; | [A]JPH0520204 ; | [A]US4744062 (NAKAMURA HIDEO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 20 - column 6, line 51; figures 1,2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880406), vol. 12, no. 104, Database accession no. (P - 685), & JP62236053 A 19871016 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO.) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930607), vol. 17, no. 296, Database accession no. (P - 1551), & JP520204 A 19930129 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO.) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |