blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0630044

EP0630044 - Forming a prescribed pattern on a semiconducor device layer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.09.1999
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip24.09.1999No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.11.1999 [1999/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/47]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP
Former [1995/01]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP
Former [1994/51]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Okumura, Katsuya, c/o Intellectual Property Div.
Toshiba Corporation, 1-1-1, Shibaura
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Watanabe, Tohru, c/o Intellectual Property Div.
Toshiba Corporation, 1-1-1, Shibaura
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Watase, Masami, c/o Intellectual Property Div.
Toshiba Corporation, 1-1-1, Shibaura
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1994/51]
Representative(s)Maury, Richard Philip, et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/51]Maury, Richard Philip, et al
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date94114930.415.08.1989
[1994/51]
Priority number, dateJP1988022350308.09.1988         Original published format: JP 22350388
[1994/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0630044
Date:21.12.1994
Language:EN
[1994/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0630044
Date:12.07.1995
Language:EN
[1995/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0630044
Date:18.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/47]
Former [1995/14]Type: A3 Search report
No.:EP0630044
Date:
Status:(deleted)
[1995/14]
[1995/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.05.1995
ClassificationIPC:H01L21/768, H01L21/321
[1998/18]
CPC:
H01L21/0332 (EP,US); H01L21/30 (KR); H01L21/02282 (EP,US);
H01L21/02164 (EP,KR,US); H01L21/0337 (EP,US); H01L21/31144 (EP,US);
H01L21/316 (US); H01L21/32 (EP,US); H01L21/32139 (EP,US);
H01L21/76802 (EP,US); H01L21/76838 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [1995/28]H01L21/90, H01L21/321
Former IPC [1994/51]H01L21/90
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1994/51]
TitleGerman:Herstellung von einem vorbeschriebenem Muster über eine Halbleitervorrichtungsschicht[1994/51]
English:Forming a prescribed pattern on a semiconducor device layer[1994/51]
French:Formation d'une configuration déterminée sur une couche d'un dispositif semi-conducteur[1994/51]
Examination procedure19.10.1994Examination requested  [1994/51]
28.02.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.07.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.02.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.06.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.03.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.04.1998Fee for grant paid
27.04.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP89308284.2  / EP0358350
Opposition(s)19.08.1999No opposition filed within time limit [1999/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
19.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
19.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
19.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
09.08.1995Renewal fee patent year 07
10.08.1996Renewal fee patent year 08
08.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 09
10.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2354633  (IBM [US]);
 [A]EP0178619  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]);
 [AD]US4599137  (AKIYA HIDEO [JP]);
 [XD]US4624749  (BLACK JIMMY C [US], et al);
 [PX]EP0304077  (TOSHIBA KK [JP])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.