EP0662336 - Back-washing filter for liquids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/28] | Back-washing filter, especially for liquids | ||
[1998/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.1999 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FILTERWERK MANN + HUMMEL GMBH Hindenburgstrasse 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/17] | For all designated states FILTERWERK MANN & HUMMEL GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45, Postfach 409 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | ||
Former [1995/28] | For all designated states FILTERWERK MANN & HUMMEL GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45 D-71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bartelt, Bertram Mörike Strasse 8 D-71711 Steinheim / DE | 02 /
Gohle, Peter Im Weizen 39 D-71636 Ludwigsburg / DE | 03 /
Schaal, Wolfgang Plattenwaldallee 51 D-71522 Backnang / DE | [1995/28] | Representative(s) | Voth, Gerhard Mann+Hummel GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Voth, Gerhard Mann+Hummel GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | ||
Former [1995/28] | Voth, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. FILTERWERK MANN + HUMMEL GMBH Postfach 4 09 D-71631 Ludwigsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 94115166.4 | 27.09.1994 | [1995/28] | Priority number, date | DE19944400485 | 11.01.1994 Original published format: DE 4400485 | [1995/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0662336 | Date: | 12.07.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0662336 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B01D33/073, B01D33/44 | [1995/28] | CPC: |
B01D29/15 (EP,KR,US);
B01D33/503 (EP,KR,US);
B01D29/6476 (EP,US);
B01D29/682 (EP,US);
B01D29/688 (EP,KR,US);
B01D29/70 (EP,KR,US);
B01D29/902 (EP,US);
B01D33/073 (EP,KR,US);
B01D33/46 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/28] | Title | German: | Rückspülbares Filter für Flüssigkeiten | [1998/17] | English: | Back-washing filter for liquids | [1998/17] | French: | Filtre de rinçage à contre-courant pour liquides | [1998/17] |
Former [1995/28] | Rückspülbares Filter, insbesondere für Flüssigkeiten | ||
Former [1995/28] | Back-washing filter, especially for liquids | ||
Former [1995/28] | Filtre de rinçage à contre-courant, en particulier pour liquides | Examination procedure | 13.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/02] | 26.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 22.04.1998 | FR | 22.04.1998 | GB | 22.04.1998 | GR | 22.04.1998 | IT | 22.04.1998 | NL | 22.04.1998 | DK | 22.07.1998 | PT | 22.07.1998 | SE | 22.07.1998 | AT | 27.09.1998 | LU | 27.09.1998 | BE | 30.09.1998 | CH | 30.09.1998 | LI | 30.09.1998 | IE | 23.10.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/38] | ES | 22.04.1998 | |
GB | 22.04.1998 | ||
GR | 22.04.1998 | ||
IT | 22.04.1998 | ||
NL | 22.04.1998 | ||
DK | 22.07.1998 | ||
PT | 22.07.1998 | ||
SE | 22.07.1998 | ||
FR | 18.09.1998 | ||
AT | 27.09.1998 | ||
LU | 27.09.1998 | ||
BE | 30.09.1998 | ||
CH | 30.09.1998 | ||
LI | 30.09.1998 | ||
IE | 23.10.1998 | ||
Former [2003/45] | ES | 22.04.1998 | |
GB | 22.04.1998 | ||
GR | 22.04.1998 | ||
IT | 22.04.1998 | ||
NL | 22.04.1998 | ||
DK | 22.07.1998 | ||
PT | 22.07.1998 | ||
SE | 22.07.1998 | ||
FR | 18.09.1998 | ||
AT | 27.09.1998 | ||
BE | 30.09.1998 | ||
CH | 30.09.1998 | ||
LI | 30.09.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
IE | 23.10.1998 | ||
Former [2003/08] | ES | 22.04.1998 | |
GB | 22.04.1998 | ||
GR | 22.04.1998 | ||
IT | 22.04.1998 | ||
NL | 22.04.1998 | ||
PT | 22.07.1998 | ||
SE | 22.07.1998 | ||
FR | 18.09.1998 | ||
AT | 27.09.1998 | ||
BE | 30.09.1998 | ||
CH | 30.09.1998 | ||
LI | 30.09.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
IE | 23.10.1998 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 22.04.1998 | |
GB | 22.04.1998 | ||
GR | 22.04.1998 | ||
IT | 22.04.1998 | ||
PT | 22.07.1998 | ||
SE | 22.07.1998 | ||
FR | 18.09.1998 | ||
AT | 27.09.1998 | ||
BE | 30.09.1998 | ||
CH | 30.09.1998 | ||
LI | 30.09.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
IE | 23.10.1998 | ||
Former [2002/10] | GB | 22.04.1998 | |
GR | 22.04.1998 | ||
IT | 22.04.1998 | ||
PT | 22.07.1998 | ||
SE | 22.07.1998 | ||
FR | 18.09.1998 | ||
AT | 27.09.1998 | ||
BE | 30.09.1998 | ||
CH | 30.09.1998 | ||
LI | 30.09.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
IE | 23.10.1998 | ||
Former [2000/52] | GB | 22.04.1998 | |
GR | 22.04.1998 | ||
IE | 22.04.1998 | ||
IT | 22.04.1998 | ||
PT | 22.07.1998 | ||
SE | 22.07.1998 | ||
FR | 18.09.1998 | ||
AT | 27.09.1998 | ||
BE | 30.09.1998 | ||
CH | 30.09.1998 | ||
LI | 30.09.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
Former [2000/24] | GB | 22.04.1998 | |
GR | 22.04.1998 | ||
IE | 22.04.1998 | ||
IT | 22.04.1998 | ||
PT | 22.07.1998 | ||
SE | 22.07.1998 | ||
FR | 18.09.1998 | ||
AT | 27.09.1998 | ||
BE | 30.09.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
Former [2000/05] | GB | 22.04.1998 | |
GR | 22.04.1998 | ||
IE | 22.04.1998 | ||
IT | 22.04.1998 | ||
PT | 22.07.1998 | ||
SE | 22.07.1998 | ||
FR | 18.09.1998 | ||
BE | 30.09.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | GB | 22.04.1998 | |
IE | 22.04.1998 | ||
IT | 22.04.1998 | ||
PT | 22.07.1998 | ||
SE | 22.07.1998 | ||
FR | 18.09.1998 | ||
BE | 30.09.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | GB | 22.04.1998 | |
IE | 22.04.1998 | ||
PT | 22.07.1998 | ||
SE | 22.07.1998 | ||
FR | 18.09.1998 | ||
BE | 30.09.1998 | ||
Former [1999/16] | GB | 22.04.1998 | |
IE | 22.04.1998 | ||
SE | 22.07.1998 | ||
FR | 18.09.1998 | ||
Former [1999/02] | GB | 22.04.1998 | |
SE | 22.07.1998 | ||
FR | 18.09.1998 | ||
Former [1998/52] | SE | 22.07.1998 | |
FR | 18.09.1998 | ||
Former [1998/44] | SE | 22.07.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0049746 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG [DE]) [AD] 1,4-6* the whole document *; | [AD]DE3209216 (MANN & HUMMEL FILTER [DE]) [AD] 1-3 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]DE9209856U (FILTERWERK MANN & HUMMEL) [A] 8-11 * page 5, line 1 - line 7; figure 1; claims 1-4 * | Examination | DE4222495 |