EP0648056 - Audio/video synchronization in a digital transmission system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2000 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.03.2000 [2000/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC. Two Independence Way, CN 5312 Princeton, N.J. 08540 / US | [1995/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lankford, Douglas Edward 11190 Oldfield Drive Carmel, Indiana 46033 / US | 02 /
Deiss, Michael Scott 1103 Indian Pipe Lane Zionsville, Indiana 46077 / US | [1995/15] | Representative(s) | Schütz, Peter v. Bezold & Sozien Patentanwälte Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/15] | Schütz, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Dieter von Bezold Dipl.-Ing. Peter Schütz Dipl.-Ing. Wolfgang Heusler Brienner Strasse 52 D-80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94115279.5 | 28.09.1994 | [1995/15] | Priority number, date | US19930129974 | 30.09.1993 Original published format: US 129974 | [1995/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0648056 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0648056 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0648056 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/24 | [1995/15] | CPC: |
H04N21/4305 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/426 (EP,US);
H04N21/43072 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/4341 (KR);
H04N21/4392 (EP,US);
H04N21/8547 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, PT [1995/15] | Title | German: | Ton-/Videosynchronisierung in einem digitalen Übertragungssystem | [1995/15] | English: | Audio/video synchronization in a digital transmission system | [1995/15] | French: | Synchronisation audio/vidéo dans un système de transmission numérique | [1995/15] | Examination procedure | 20.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/29] | 26.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0446956 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 14 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 31 * * column 5, line 38 - column 6, line 44 * * column 9, line 9 - line 21 * * claims 5,7,8 * * figures 2,3,10 * [A] 1-5,8-10,12,13; | [PXA]EP0602943 (SONY CORP [JP]) [PX] 5,6,8-10,14 * column 4, line 24 - column 6, line 36 * * column 9, line 44 - column 15, line 24 * * column 16, line 12 - line 26 * * claims 8,12,17 * [PA] 1-4,12,13; | [PXA]EP0577329 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [PX] 14 * column 3, line 33 - column 6, line 22 * * column 9, line 3 - line 37 * * figure - * [PA] 1,4-6,8,10,11,13 | [A] - MACINNIS, "The MPEG systems coding specification", SIGNAL PROCESSING IMAGE COMMUNICATION., AMSTERDAM NL, vol. 4, no. 2, pages 153 - 159, XP000273161 [A] 1,4,5,8,10,13,14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0923-5965(92)90021-7 |