blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0645940

EP0645940 - Base station device and mobile station device in mobile communication systems [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.12.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip01.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.01.2001 [2001/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NTT MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK INC.
10-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1995/13]For all designated states
NTT MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK INC.
10-1, Toranomon 2-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Douzono, Youichi
102 Sanivira, 121-23, Yoshimatu
Dazaihu, Hukuoka / JP
02 / Umeda, Narumi
2-201, 968-12, Mutuuracho, Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP
[1995/13]
Representative(s)Lehn, Werner, et al
Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/13]Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4
D-81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date94115369.429.09.1994
[1995/13]
Priority number, dateJP1993024273529.09.1993         Original published format: JP 24273593
[1995/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0645940
Date:29.03.1995
Language:EN
[1995/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0645940
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.01.1995
ClassificationIPC:H04Q7/20
[1995/13]
CPC:
H04W52/40 (EP,US); H04W36/18 (EP,US); H04W52/0203 (EP,US);
H04W52/0245 (EP,US); H04W52/36 (EP,US); H04W52/58 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   SE [1995/13]
TitleGerman:Basisstationsanordnung und Mobilstationsanordnung in mobilen Kommunikationssystemen[1995/13]
English:Base station device and mobile station device in mobile communication systems[1995/13]
French:Station de base et station mobile dans des systèmes de communication[1995/13]
Examination procedure29.09.1994Examination requested  [1995/13]
04.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.11.1999Fee for grant paid
05.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0160993  (SEL ALCATEL AG [DE]);
 [XA]EP0241954  (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE], et al);
 [X]EP0330166  (SIEMENS AG [DE]);
 [A]EP0548939  (NEC CORP [JP])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.