EP0646853 - Pneumatic pressure regulator system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.1999 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.1999 [1999/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HER MAJESTY THE QUEEN IN RIGHT OF CANADA AS REPRESENTED BY THE MINISTER OF NATIONAL DEFENCE National Defence Headquarters Pearkes Building 101, Colonel By Drive Ottawa Ontario K1A 0K2 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1995/14] | For all designated states HER MAJESTY THE QUEEN IN RIGHT OF CANADA AS REPRESENTED BY THE MINISTER OF NATIONAL DEFENCE National Defence Headquarters Pearkes Building 101, Colonel By Drive Ottawa, Ontario K1A 0K2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Farrell, Philip S. E. 29 Yeomans Road North York, Ontario, N3H 3J6 / CA | 02 /
Goldenberg, Andrew A. 27 Ridge Hill Road Toronto, Ontario, M6C 3C3 / CA | 03 /
Meidan, Daniel 90 Elise Terrace North York, Ontario, M2R 2X1 / CA | [1995/14] | Representative(s) | Asquith, Anthony Anthony Asquith & Co. 123 Main Street Scholes, Leeds LS15 4DP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/14] | Asquith, Anthony Anthony Asquith & Co 328 Leeds Road Scholes Leeds, LS15 4DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 94115577.2 | 04.10.1994 | [1995/14] | Priority number, date | CA19932107693 | 05.10.1993 Original published format: CA 2107693 | [1995/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0646853 | Date: | 05.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0646853 | Date: | 07.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G05D16/20 | [1995/14] | CPC: |
G05D16/202 (EP,US);
G05D16/2024 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0753 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86622 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86662 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86751 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, PT, SE [1995/14] | Title | German: | Pneumatisches Drucksteuersystem | [1995/14] | English: | Pneumatic pressure regulator system | [1995/14] | French: | Système de régulation pneumatique | [1995/14] | Examination procedure | 02.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/49] | 02.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/33] | 19.03.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1999/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1650292 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO) [Y] 1,2,11 * page 8, line 1 - line 24; figures 4-5 *; | [Y]EP0245068 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2,11 * page 4, line 18 - page 6, line 65 * * page 11, line 20 - page 12, line 28 *; | [A]EP0278861 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [A] 1,11 * column 4, line 59 - column 5, line 24 *; | [A]US4928494 (GLAMM PAUL R [US]) [A] 1,11* column W *; | [A]US5246201 (MESSICK WALKER A [US]) [A] 1,11 * column W * |