blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0705601

EP0705601 - Anthraquinones containing solutions for parenteral administration [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LOMAPHARM Rudolf Lohmann GmbH KG Pharmazeutische Fabrik
Langes Feld 5
31860 Emmerthal / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
LOMAPHARM Rudolf Lohmann GmbH KG Pharmazeutische Fabrik
Langes Feld 5
31860 Emmerthal / DE
Former [1996/15]For all designated states
LOMAPHARM Rudolf Lohmann GmbH KG Pharmazeutische Fabrik
Langes Feld 5
D-31860 Emmerthal / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Glänzer, Klaus Dr.
Stübekamp 55
D-22337 Hamburg / DE
[1996/15]
Representative(s)SSM Sandmair
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/15]Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Stuntzstrasse 16
D-81677 München / DE
Application number, filing date94115597.004.10.1994
[1996/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0705601
Date:10.04.1996
Language:DE
[1996/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0705601
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.03.1995
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/12, A61K31/19, A61K31/70, A61K47/14, A61K47/22, A61K47/40
[1996/15]
CPC:
A61K31/704 (EP); A61K31/122 (EP); A61K31/136 (EP);
A61K31/192 (EP); A61K47/14 (EP); A61K47/22 (EP);
A61K47/40 (EP); A61K9/0019 (EP); C09B1/02 (EP);
C09B67/0038 (EP); C09B67/0083 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [2000/03]
Former [1996/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Lösungen von Anthrachinonen zur parenteralen Applikation[1996/15]
English:Anthraquinones containing solutions for parenteral administration[1996/15]
French:Solutions contenant des anthraquinones pour administration parentérale[1996/15]
Examination procedure04.10.1994Examination requested  [1996/15]
05.10.1995Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
30.01.1996Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DK, ES, GR, IE, MC, PT
16.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
18.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
30.03.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.06.1999Fee for grant paid
02.06.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
29.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
14.11.1995DK   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.1995ES   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.1995GR   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.1995IE   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.1995MC   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.1995PT   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR19.01.2000
IT19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
AT04.10.2000
GB04.10.2000
LU04.10.2000
[2008/05]
Former [2007/29]FR19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
AT04.10.2000
GB04.10.2000
LU04.10.2000
Former [2003/08]FR19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
AT04.10.2000
GB04.10.2000
Former [2002/32]FR19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
AT04.10.2000
GB04.10.2000
Former [2002/23]SE19.01.2000
AT04.10.2000
GB04.10.2000
Former [2002/15]AT04.10.2000
GB04.10.2000
Former [2002/12]GB04.10.2000
Documents cited:SearchJPS5643210  [ ] (HAYASHI KOUTAKU);
 [A]EP0154117  (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [A] 1-8 * claim - ** page 21, line 1 - line 33 *;
 [A]EP0236822  (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [A] 1-8 * claim - *;
 [A]EP0256285  (BEHRINGWERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * claim - * * page 2, line 40 - line 52 * * examples 1-2 *;
 JPH01121215  [ ] (NIPPON HYPOX LAB INC);
 JPH02149515  [ ] (TSUMURA & CO);
 JPH0374326  [ ] (TSUMURA & CO);
 [DA]EP0454058  (LOHMANN RUDOLF LOMAPHARM [DE]) [DA] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9214454  (RADOPATH LTD [GB]) [A] 1-8 * claims 1-13 * * page 10, line 10 - line 22 *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 91, no. 19, Database accession no. 91-136894 (19) [A] 1-8 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 29, Database accession no. 90-220785 (29) [A] 1-8 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 81, no. 23, Database accession no. 81-41287D (23) [A] 1-8 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 25, Database accession no. 89-182758 (25) [A] 1-8 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.