EP0653261 - Tundish and nozzle block for the tundish [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIDIER-WERKE AG Lessingstrasse 16-18 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [1998/30] |
Former [1995/20] | For all designated states DIDIER-WERKE AG Lessingstrasse 16-18 D-65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Engelmann, Kurt Alte Krefelder Strasse 64a D-47829 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
Keisers, Laurenz Pastoriusstrasse 101 D-47809 Krefeld / DE | [1995/20] | Representative(s) | Brückner, Raimund Didier-Werke AG Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 1 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/20] | Brückner, Raimund, Dipl.-Ing. c/o Didier-Werke AG Lessingstrasse 16-18 D-65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 94116141.6 | 13.10.1994 | [1995/20] | Priority number, date | DE19934338859 | 13.11.1993 Original published format: DE 4338859 | [1995/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0653261 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0653261 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/10, B22D41/50, B22D41/08 | [1995/20] | CPC: |
B22D41/08 (EP,US);
B22D11/147 (EP,US);
B22D41/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/20] | Title | German: | Verteilergefäss und Auslaufblock für dieses | [1995/20] | English: | Tundish and nozzle block for the tundish | [1995/20] | French: | Poche de coulée avec busette de coulée pour cette poche | [1995/20] | Examination procedure | 13.10.1994 | Examination requested [1995/20] | 09.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 22.07.1998 | GR | 22.07.1998 | IT | 22.07.1998 | NL | 22.07.1998 | LU | 13.10.1998 | DK | 22.10.1998 | PT | 22.10.1998 | SE | 22.10.1998 | IE | 19.02.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/38] | ES | 22.07.1998 | |
GR | 22.07.1998 | ||
NL | 22.07.1998 | ||
LU | 13.10.1998 | ||
DK | 22.10.1998 | ||
PT | 22.10.1998 | ||
SE | 22.10.1998 | ||
IE | 19.02.1999 | ||
Former [2003/45] | ES | 22.07.1998 | |
GR | 22.07.1998 | ||
NL | 22.07.1998 | ||
DK | 22.10.1998 | ||
PT | 22.10.1998 | ||
SE | 22.10.1998 | ||
LU | 31.10.1998 | ||
IE | 19.02.1999 | ||
Former [2003/08] | ES | 22.07.1998 | |
GR | 22.07.1998 | ||
NL | 22.07.1998 | ||
PT | 22.10.1998 | ||
SE | 22.10.1998 | ||
LU | 31.10.1998 | ||
IE | 19.02.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 22.07.1998 | |
GR | 22.07.1998 | ||
PT | 22.10.1998 | ||
SE | 22.10.1998 | ||
LU | 31.10.1998 | ||
IE | 19.02.1999 | ||
Former [2002/10] | GR | 22.07.1998 | |
PT | 22.10.1998 | ||
SE | 22.10.1998 | ||
LU | 31.10.1998 | ||
IE | 19.02.1999 | ||
Former [2001/01] | GR | 22.07.1998 | |
IE | 22.07.1998 | ||
PT | 22.10.1998 | ||
SE | 22.10.1998 | ||
LU | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [2000/05] | GR | 22.07.1998 | |
PT | 22.10.1998 | ||
SE | 22.10.1998 | ||
LU | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/29] | PT | 22.10.1998 | |
SE | 22.10.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AT210077B (BOEHLER & CO AG GEB)[A] 1,5; | [A]DE3842121 (HORNUNG KARL OTTO [CH]) [A] 1,5,8; | [A]EP0352353 (INTRACON HANDEL [DE]) [A] 1,5,8; | [A]DE4024351 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [A] 1,5,8 |