EP0671596 - Heat exchanger for cooling of hot reaction gas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Babcock-Borsig Aktiengesellschaft Egellsstrasse 21 13507 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/37] | For all designated states Deutsche Babcock-Borsig Aktiengesellschaft Egellsstrasse 21 D-13507 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brücher, Peter Ziegenorter Pfad 33 D-13503 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Lachmann, Helmut Gottfried-von-Cramm-Weg 35 D-14195 Berlin / DE | [1995/37] | Representative(s) | Müller, Jürgen Deutsche Babcock AG Lizenz- und Patentabteilung Duisburger Strasse 375 46049 Oberhausen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/37] | Müller, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Deutsche Babcock AG Lizenz- und Patentabteilung Duisburger Strasse 375 D-46049 Oberhausen / DE | Application number, filing date | 94116452.7 | 19.10.1994 | [1995/37] | Priority number, date | DE19944407594 | 08.03.1994 Original published format: DE 4407594 | [1995/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0671596 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F28F9/02, F28D7/00 | [1995/37] | CPC: |
F28D7/005 (EP,US);
F28F9/0229 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/37] | Title | German: | Wärmetauscher zum Kühlen von heissem Reaktionsgas | [1995/37] | English: | Heat exchanger for cooling of hot reaction gas | [1995/37] | French: | Echangeur de chaleur pour le réfroidissement de gaz chaud de réaction | [1995/37] | Examination procedure | 18.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/46] | 31.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.08.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1998/02] | 17.08.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US1831971 (SANDSTROM CHARLES O) [Y] 4,6,7 * column W * [A] 1,2,5,10; | [YA]FR1432446 (BORSIG AG) [Y] 8,11 * the whole document *[A] 1,2; | [XAY]GB1291847 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 10 [Y] 4,6-8,11 |