blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0651004

EP0651004 - Biaxially oriented polyolefinfilm, process for its preparation and use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.11.2003
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.01.2004  [2004/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Trespaphan GmbH
Bergstrasse
66539 Neunkirchen / DE
[2000/42]
Former [1998/17]For all designated states
Hoechst Trespaphan GmbH
Bergstrasse
66539 Neunkirchen / DE
Former [1995/18]For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Peiffer, Herbert, Dr.
Thüringer Strasse 26
D-55126 Mainz / DE
02 / Schlögl, Günter, Dr.
Finkenweg 2
D-65799 Kelkheim / DE
[1995/18]
Representative(s)Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L.
Patentanwälte
Postfach 3929
65029 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/17]Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR
Patentanwälte, Postfach 3929
65029 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date94116479.019.10.1994
[1995/18]
Priority number, dateDE1993433656027.10.1993         Original published format: DE 4336560
[1995/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0651004
Date:03.05.1995
Language:DE
[1995/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0651004
Date:22.01.2003
Language:DE
[2003/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.02.1995
ClassificationIPC:C08J5/18, B32B27/32, B29C55/08
[1995/18]
CPC:
B32B27/32 (EP,US); B29C55/143 (EP,US); B32B27/08 (US);
B32B27/20 (US); B32B38/0012 (US); B32B38/0036 (US);
C08J5/18 (EP,US); B29C71/00 (EP,US); B32B2038/0028 (US);
B32B2307/518 (US); B32B2309/02 (US); B32B2323/043 (US);
B32B2323/046 (US); B32B2519/00 (US); B32B2553/00 (US);
C08J2323/10 (EP,US); Y10S428/91 (EP,US); Y10T428/1328 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1331 (EP,US); Y10T428/1352 (EP,US); Y10T428/1397 (EP,US);
Y10T428/259 (EP,US); Y10T428/31909 (EP,US); Y10T428/31913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31938 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1995/18]
TitleGerman:Biaxial orientierte Polyolefinfolie, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung[1995/18]
English:Biaxially oriented polyolefinfilm, process for its preparation and use[1995/18]
French:Feuille en polyoléfine etirée biaxialement, procédé pour sa préparation et utilisation[1995/18]
Examination procedure03.11.1995Examination requested  [1996/01]
20.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.09.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.08.2002Fee for grant paid
30.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.10.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
02.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
02.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
31.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
31.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH05154905  ;
 [X]EP0423630  (TOYO BOSEKI [JP]) [X] 9-12 * page 5, line 36 - line 47 * * page 7, line 30 - page 8, line 17 *;
 [Y]US5152946  (GILLETTE PAUL C [US]) [Y] 1-20 * column 3, line 21 - line 53 * * column 1, line 18 - line 44 * * column 2, line 31 - line 46 *;
 [Y]EP0538746  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 1-20 * page 2, line 40 - page 3, line 24 * * page 4, line 54 - page 5, line 18 *;
 [DA]DE4141989  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [DA] 6-8 * page 3, line 7 - line 30 * * page 4, line 40 - line 53 ** page 4, line 65 - page 5, line 4 *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 93-231949, & JPH05154905 A 19930622 (TORAY) [X] 1-4,9 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.