EP0652204 - Process for the preparation of carboxylic acid chlorides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.1995 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.1995 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.07.1995 [1995/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/19] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ettl, Roland, Dr. Fritz-Haber-Strasse 3b D-67454 Hassloch / DE | 02 /
Reuther, Wolfgang, Dr. Am Pferchelhang 16 D-69118 Heidelberg / DE | [1995/19] | Application number, filing date | 94116962.5 | 27.10.1994 | [1995/19] | Priority number, date | DE19934337785 | 05.11.1993 Original published format: DE 4337785 | [1995/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0652204 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07C51/60 | [1995/19] | CPC: |
C07C51/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Carbonsäurechloriden | [1995/19] | English: | Process for the preparation of carboxylic acid chlorides | [1995/19] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de chlorures d'acides carboxyliques | [1995/19] | File destroyed: | 11.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 24.05.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0475137 (BASF AG) [X] 1-4 * page 3, line 45 - line 52 * * page 4, line 21 - line 41 * * page 5, line 10 - line 14 * |