EP0664379 - Vent duct for combustible vapours, particularly for lubricating oil, in an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OFFICINE METALLURGICHE G. CORNAGLIA S.p.A. Strada Mirafiori, 31 10092 Beinasco / IT | [1998/36] |
Former [1995/30] | For all designated states OFFICINE METALLURGICHE G. CORNAGLIA S.p.A. Strada Mirafiori, 31 I-10092 Beinasco / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bordignon, Gianfranco Via Canonica, 5/I I-10137 Torino / IT | 02 /
Ramponi, Claudio Via S. Michele, 19 I-10094 Giaveno / IT | [1995/47] |
Former [1995/30] | 01 /
Bordignon, Gianfranco Via Canonica, 5/I I-10137 Torino / IT | ||
02 /
Ramponi, Claudio Via S. Michele, 19 I-10094 Collegno / IT | Representative(s) | Plebani, Rinaldo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/30] | Plebani, Rinaldo, et al c/o Studio Torta, Via Viotti 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 94117113.4 | 28.10.1994 | [1995/30] | Priority number, date | IT1994TO00009U | 20.01.1994 Original published format: IT TO940009 U | [1995/30] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0664379 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0664379 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F01M13/02, F02M35/04 | [1995/30] | CPC: |
F01M13/022 (EP);
F02F7/006 (EP);
F02M25/06 (EP);
F02M35/04 (EP);
F02M35/10222 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [1995/30] | Title | German: | Entlüftungsleitung für brennbare Dämpfe, insbesondere für Schmieröl in einer Brennkraftmaschine | [1995/30] | English: | Vent duct for combustible vapours, particularly for lubricating oil, in an internal combustion engine | [1995/30] | French: | Conduit d'évacuation pour des vapeurs combustibles, notamment pour l'huile de graissage dans un moteur à combustion interne | [1995/30] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/12] | 03.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 02.09.1998 | GB | 02.12.1998 | SE | 02.12.1998 | DE | 03.12.1998 | [2002/26] |
Former [2000/03] | GB | 02.12.1998 | |
SE | 02.12.1998 | ||
DE | 03.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | SE | 02.12.1998 | |
DE | 03.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/30] | DE | 03.12.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2250028 (CHRYSLER UK [GB]) [Y] 1 * page 3, line 26 - line 30; figure - *; | [Y]FR2625256 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 1 * figure - *; | [A]FR2013859 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [A] 1,3 * figure . *; | [A]US4995891 (JAYNES ALAN [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 7 - line 17; figure - *; | [A]DE3625376 (PORSCHE AG) [A] 2 * figure - *; | [PA]JPH0681624 | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940627), vol. 18, no. 338, Database accession no. (M - 1628), & JP06081624 A 19940322 (TOYOTA AUTOM LOOM WORKS) [PA] 2,3 * abstract * * figure . * |