blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0658648

EP0658648 - Process and apparatus for continuously separating desirable and undesirable substances in a fibrous suspension [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.12.2000 [2000/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schultz, Hans-Joachim, Dr.
Martinistrasse 2/1
88214 Ravensburg / DE
[2000/02]
Former [1995/25]For all designated states
Schultz, Hans-Joachim, Dr.
Martinistrasse 2/1
D-88214 Ravensburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1995/25]
Representative(s)Meyer-Roedern, Giso
Bergheimer Strasse 10-12
69115 Heidelberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]Meyer-Roedern, Giso, Dr.
Bergheimer Strasse 10-12
69115 Heidelberg / DE
Former [1998/38]Sparing, Rolf Klaus, Dipl. Wirtsch.-Ing.
Alt-Pempelfort 3
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [1998/30](deleted)
Former [1998/04]Weitzel, Wolfgang, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwalt, et al
Friedenstrasse 10
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Former [1996/50]Petra, Elke, Dipl.-Ing.
Will & Petra Rechts- und Patentanwälte Neue Poststrasse 21
85598 Baldham / DE
Former [1995/25]Weitzel, Wolfgang, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwalt
Friedenstrasse 10
D-89522 Heidenheim / DE
Application number, filing date94117139.929.10.1994
[1995/25]
Priority number, dateDE1993434228911.12.1993         Original published format: DE 4342289
[1995/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0658648
Date:21.06.1995
Language:DE
[1995/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0658648
Date:07.02.1996
[1996/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0658648
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.12.1995
ClassificationIPC:D21D5/24, D21F1/06
[1996/05]
CPC:
B03B13/00 (EP); B04C5/28 (EP); D21D5/24 (EP);
D21F1/065 (EP)
Former IPC [1995/25]D21D5/24
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT,   SE [1995/25]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum kontinuierlichen Trennen von in einer Stoffsuspension enthaltenen erwünschten von unerwünschten Stoffen[1995/25]
English:Process and apparatus for continuously separating desirable and undesirable substances in a fibrous suspension[1995/25]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour la séparation en continu de substances désirables et indésirables dans une suspension de fibres[1995/25]
Examination procedure14.06.1995Examination requested  [1995/32]
25.10.1996Request for accelerated examination filed
03.03.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.03.1997Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
11.07.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.04.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.05.1999Fee for grant paid
26.05.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
05.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.11.199704   M06   Fee paid on   12.11.1997
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE2926751  (OISHIKIKAI MFG CO) [Y] 1,2,5-8,10,11,13,14 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE4114668  (SCHULTZ HANS JOACHIM DR ING [DE]) [Y] 1,2,5-8,10,11,13,14 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.