blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0657901

EP0657901 - Ducted air-cooled secondary of automobile battery charging transformer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip26.12.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 11.02.2004  [2004/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION
P.O. Box 33114
Detroit, MI 48232 / US
[1999/24]
Former [1999/03]For all designated states
Hughes Electronics Corporation
200N. Sepulveda Boulevard
El Segundo, California 90245-0956 / US
Former [1999/02]For all designated states
HE HOLDINGS, INC.
7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066
Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US
Former [1995/24]For all designated states
Hughes Aircraft Company
7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066
Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Tanzer, Herbert J.
20894 Waveview Drive
Topanga, CA 90290 / US
02 / Qoun, William
1641 Edgewood Drive
Alhambra, CA 91803 / US
03 / Hall, John T.
21831 Ambar Drive
Woodland Hills, CA 91364 / US
[1995/24]
Representative(s)Otten, Hajo, et al
Witte, Weller, Gahlert, Otten & Steil
Patentanwälte
Rotebühlstrasse 121
70178 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/24]Otten, Hajo, Dr.-Ing., et al
Witte, Weller, Gahlert & Otten Patentanwälte Rotebühlstrasse 121
D-70178 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date94117147.229.10.1994
[1995/24]
Priority number, dateUS1993014669002.11.1993         Original published format: US 146690
[1995/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0657901
Date:14.06.1995
Language:EN
[1995/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0657901
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.02.1995
ClassificationIPC:H01F38/00, H01F38/14, H02J7/00
[1995/24]
CPC:
H02J7/0042 (EP,US); H01F27/00 (KR); H01F27/085 (EP,US);
H01F38/14 (EP,US); Y10S336/02 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1995/24]
TitleGerman:Mit Luftkanälen zur Kühlung versehene Sekundärwicklung eines Transformators zum Laden einer Fahrzeugbatterie[1995/24]
English:Ducted air-cooled secondary of automobile battery charging transformer[1995/24]
French:Enroulement secondaire à conduits d'air de refroidissement pour transformateur chargeur de batterie de véhicule automobile[1995/24]
Examination procedure01.12.1995Examination requested  [1996/05]
08.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.05.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.08.1999Fee for grant paid
17.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
24.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
21.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR05.01.2000
[2004/07]
Documents cited:Search[A]FR1538044  (SIEMENS AG);
 [A]DE4114576  (FIEDLER NORBERT [DE]);
 [A]EP0552737  (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]);
 [A]EP0552738  (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.