EP0651404 - Internal cooling of electric automobile charging transformer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.11.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/18] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Quon, William 1641 Edgewood Drive Alhambra, CA 91803 / US | 02 /
Tanzer, Herbert J. 20894 Waveview Drive Topanga, CA 90290 / US | [1995/18] | Representative(s) | Otten, Hajo, et al Witte, Weller, Gahlert, Otten & Steil Patentanwälte Rotebühlstrasse 121 70178 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/18] | Otten, Hajo, Dr.-Ing., et al Witte, Weller, Gahlert & Otten Patentanwälte Rotebühlstrasse 121 D-70178 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 94117148.0 | 29.10.1994 | [1995/18] | Priority number, date | US19930146762 | 02.11.1993 Original published format: US 146762 | [1995/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0651404 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0651404 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01F38/00, H01F38/14, H02J7/00 | [1995/18] | CPC: |
H02J7/0042 (EP,US);
H01F27/00 (KR);
B60L53/126 (EP,US);
B60L53/34 (EP,US);
H01F27/2876 (EP);
H01F38/00 (KR);
H01F38/14 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/18] | Title | German: | Innenkühlungssystem eines zum Laden eines elektrischen Fahrzeugs geeigneten Transformators | [1995/18] | English: | Internal cooling of electric automobile charging transformer | [1995/18] | French: | Refroidissement interne de transformation chargeur de véhicule automobile électrique | [1995/18] | Examination procedure | 24.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/51] | 14.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 02.01.1997 | CH | 02.01.1997 | DK | 02.01.1997 | GR | 02.01.1997 | LI | 02.01.1997 | SE | 02.04.1997 | [2000/05] |
Former [1998/15] | BE | 02.01.1997 | |
CH | 02.01.1997 | ||
DK | 02.01.1997 | ||
LI | 02.01.1997 | ||
SE | 02.04.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | BE | 02.01.1997 | |
CH | 02.01.1997 | ||
LI | 02.01.1997 | ||
SE | 02.04.1997 | ||
Former [1998/04] | BE | 02.01.1997 | |
CH | 02.01.1997 | ||
LI | 02.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/49] | BE | 02.01.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1538044 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]DE4114576 (FIEDLER NORBERT [DE]); | [A]EP0552737 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]); | [A]EP0552738 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) |