EP0653521 - Toilet, in particular portable toilet for boats, caravans or mobile homes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.12.1999 [1999/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Camping Gaz (Deutschland) GmbH Am Eisernen Steg 20 65795 Hattersheim / DE | [1998/03] |
Former [1995/20] | For all designated states CAMPING GAZ INTERNATIONAL (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH Am Eisernen Steg 20 D-65795 Hattersheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baumgartner, Heinz Mühlenstrasse 33 D-76275 Ettlingen / DE | [1995/20] | Representative(s) | Kern, Wolfgang Patentanwälte KERN, VOLPERT & KOLLEGEN Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 73 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/20] | Kern, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Kern, Brehm & Partner Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 73 D-81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94117789.1 | 10.11.1994 | [1995/20] | Priority number, date | DE19930017303U | 11.11.1993 Original published format: DE 9317303 U | [1995/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0653521 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0653521 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | [1996/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E03D5/01, F04B9/14, B60R15/00, B63B29/14 | [1996/17] | CPC: |
B63B29/14 (EP);
B60R15/04 (EP);
E03D5/01 (EP);
F04B9/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/20] | E03D5/01 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT [1995/20] | Title | German: | Toilette, insbesondere tragbare Toilette für Boote, Wohnwagen oder Reisemobile | [1995/20] | English: | Toilet, in particular portable toilet for boats, caravans or mobile homes | [1995/20] | French: | Toilette, notamment toilette portative pour les bateaux, les caravanes ou les camping-cars | [1995/20] | Examination procedure | 14.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/42] | 01.06.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/50] | 02.07.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1999/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1998 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4091475 (HEWSON) [X] 1 * column 8, line 62 - column 10, line 8; figures 9-12 * [Y] 2-7; | [Y]US4265375 (FLIDER) [Y] 2-7 * column 5, line 1 - column 5, line 45 * * column 6, line 17 - column 7, line 2; figure 2 *; | [A]FR1043161 (MICRONIC) [A] 2-5 * en entier *; | [A]GB324437 (BERESFORD); | [AD]US3570018 (SARGENT) |