Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0653521
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
29.10.1999 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 15.12.1999 [1999/50] |
29.06.1999 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
04.01.1999 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
28.11.1997 |
Change - applicant |
published on 14.01.1998 [1998/03] |
30.10.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.11.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.08.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.10.1996 [1996/42] |
08.03.1996 |
Change - classification |
published on 24.04.1996 [1996/17] |
02.03.1996 |
Publication of search report |
published on 17.04.1996 [1996/16] |
31.03.1995 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.05.1995 [1995/20] |