EP0658067 - Control for evaluating sensor signals of domestic appliances [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.10.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2001 | Refusal of application | published on 12.12.2001 [2001/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 81669 München / DE | [1998/29] |
Former [1995/24] | For all designated states Bosch-Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 D-81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hess, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Gartenstrasse 13 D-83301 Traunreut / DE | 02 /
Beifuss, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Eglseer Str. 5 D-83339 Chieming / DE | 03 /
Schweidler, Ernst Am Steinanger 6 D-83371 Stein/Traun / DE | 04 /
Has, Uwe, Dipl.-Ing. Harter Str. 5 D-84579 Unterneukirchen / DE | [1995/24] | Application number, filing date | 94117875.8 | 11.11.1994 | [1995/24] | Priority number, date | DE19934341485 | 06.12.1993 Original published format: DE 4341485 | [1995/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0658067 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/74 | [1995/24] | CPC: |
H05B3/746 (EP);
G05D23/24 (EP);
H05B2213/05 (EP);
H05B2213/07 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/24] | Title | German: | Steuerung für Haushaltgeräte zur Auswertung von Sensorsignalen | [1995/24] | English: | Control for evaluating sensor signals of domestic appliances | [1995/24] | French: | Commande pour l'évaluation des signaux des capteurs d'un appareil électro-ménager | [1995/24] | Examination procedure | 30.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/05] | 03.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2001/50] | 17.07.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2001/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4740664 (PAYNE THOMAS R [US], et al) [Y] 1,3-9 * column 6, line 66 - column 10, line 3; figures 1-6 * * column 12, line 21 - column 18, line 14; figures 7-11 *; | [YA]EP0467134 (SCHOTT GLASWERKE [DE], et al) [Y] 1,3-9 * column 7, line 18 - column 12, line 3; figures 1-6 * [A] 2; | [Y]DE3530403 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE]) [Y] 8 * page 12, line 6 - page 16, line 21; figure 16 *; | [A]EP0478081 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIQUE LAB [FR], et al); | [A]EP0553425 (WHIRLPOOL EUROP [NL]); | [A]EP0147056 (THORN EMI DOMESTIC APPLIANCES [GB]) |