EP0657633 - Partially filled boiling liquid cooling system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.08.1998 [1998/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/36] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft 80788 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/24] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung AJ-3 D-80788 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mader, Reinhard Weihererstrasse 24 D-85276 Pfaffenhofen / DE | [1995/24] | Application number, filing date | 94117995.4 | 15.11.1994 | [1995/24] | Priority number, date | DE19934341927 | 09.12.1993 Original published format: DE 4341927 | [1995/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0657633 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0657633 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F01P3/22, F01P11/02, F28F9/02 | [1995/24] | CPC: |
F01P11/029 (EP);
F01P3/2271 (EP);
F28F9/0231 (EP);
F01P2003/2221 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/24] | Title | German: | Teilgeflutetes Verdampfungskühlsystem | [1995/24] | English: | Partially filled boiling liquid cooling system | [1995/24] | French: | Système de refroidissement par évaporation avec de remblayage partiel | [1995/24] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/34] | 04.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8603554 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [PA]DE4231846 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [PA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2532740 (VALEO [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0496942 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]EP0571248 (VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR SA [FR]) [A] 1 * figure - * |