EP0653170 - A device for inspecting filter end face of manufactured filter cigarette [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2000 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.10.2000 [2000/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Tobacco Inc. 12-62, Higashishinagawa 4-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/20] | For all designated states JAPAN TOBACCO INC. 12-62, Higashishinagawa 4-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsumura, Takeshi, c/o Japan Tobacco Inc., Mach. Technology R&D Center, 20-46, Horifune 2-chome Kita-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Muramoto, Hidenori, c/o Japan Tobacco Inc., Mach. Technology R&D Center, 20-46, Horifune 2-chome Kita-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Komori, Mikio, c/o Japan Tobacco Inc., Mach. Technology R&D Center, 20-46, Horifune 2-chome Kita-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1995/20] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/20] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Postfach 44 01 51 D-80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94118005.1 | 15.11.1994 | [1995/20] | Priority number, date | JP19930286655 | 16.11.1993 Original published format: JP 28665593 | [1995/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0653170 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0653170 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A24C5/34, G01N21/15 | [1995/20] | CPC: |
A24C5/3412 (EP,US);
Y10S131/905 (EP);
Y10S131/906 (EP);
Y10S131/907 (EP);
Y10S131/908 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1995/20] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Prüfen der Enden von Filterzigaretten | [1995/20] | English: | A device for inspecting filter end face of manufactured filter cigarette | [1995/20] | French: | Dispositif pour vérifier l'extrémité des cigarettes à filtre | [1995/20] | Examination procedure | 13.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/50] | 07.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2896854 (NOBLE CARL M, et al) [Y] 1,2 * column W *; | [Y]US3818223 (GIBSON G, et al) [Y] 1,2 * column A *; | [A]GB2176598 (KOERBER AG) [A] 1,4-7 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2193314 (MOLINS PLC) [A] 1,4-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0338241 (FOCKE & CO [DE]) |