EP0654757 - A printing apparatus and a control method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 21.06.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2002 | Opposition rejected | published on 07.08.2002 [2002/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | ||
Former [1995/21] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Teradaira, Mitsuaki, Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392 / JP | 02 /
Koakutsu, Naohiko, Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392 / JP | 03 /
Hyonaga, Takuya, Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392 / JP | [1995/21] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/21] | Hoffmann, Eckart, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Bahnhofstrasse 103 D-82166 Gräfelfing / DE | Application number, filing date | 94118030.9 | 15.11.1994 | [1995/21] | Priority number, date | JP19930287002 | 16.11.1993 Original published format: JP 28700293 | [1995/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0654757 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0654757 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0654757 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G06K15/00, G06F3/12 | [1999/12] | CPC: |
G06K15/00 (EP,US);
G06F3/1207 (EP,US);
G06F3/1229 (EP,US);
G06F3/1284 (EP,US);
G06K2215/0017 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/44] | G06K15/00, G06K15/02 | ||
Former IPC [1995/21] | G06K15/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/21] | Title | German: | Druckvorrichtung und Steuerungsverfahren dafür | [1995/21] | English: | A printing apparatus and a control method therefor | [1995/21] | French: | Appareil d'impression et méthode pour son contrôle | [1995/21] | Examination procedure | 15.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/21] | 19.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 12.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.11.2000
ADMISSIBLE Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP Opponent's representative Roth, Ronald G. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Patentanwälte, P.O.Box 20 19 18 80019 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.11.2000
ADMISSIBLE Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP Opponent's representative Roth, Ronald, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Patentanwälte, P.O.Box 20 19 18 80019 München / DE | 06.12.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.06.2001 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.02.2002 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2002/32] | 06.02.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.03.2002 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.03.2002 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4930087 (EGAWA JIRO [JP], et al); | [X]GB2225468 (RICOH KK [JP]) [X] 1-5,10,12,13 * page 2, line 24 - page 4, line 15; claim - * * page 42, line 22 - page 46, line 4 *; | [XA]US5124809 (KOISHIKAWA AKIRA [JP]) [X] 1,10 * column 29, line 59 - column 30, line 21; claim - * [A] 2-9,11-16 |