EP0658676 - Glazing system for the building façades [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/25] | Glazing system for the outer building walls | ||
[1997/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.09.1998 [1998/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stückemann, Peter Kruppstrasse 19 D-58227 Ahlen / DE | [1995/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/25] | Representative(s) | Schulze Horn, Stefan, et al Goldstrasse 50 48147 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/25] | Schulze Horn, Stefan, Dipl.-Ing. M.Sc., et al Goldstrasse 50 D-48147 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 94118111.7 | 17.11.1994 | [1995/25] | Priority number, date | DE19930019530U | 18.12.1993 Original published format: DE 9319530 U | [1995/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0658676 | Date: | 21.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0658676 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/62 | [1995/25] | CPC: |
E06B3/62 (EP);
E06B2003/6229 (EP);
E06B2003/6241 (EP);
E06B2003/6244 (EP);
E06B2003/6261 (EP);
E06B2003/6291 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, LI [1995/25] | Title | German: | Verglasungssystem für Aussenwände von Gebäuden | [1995/25] | English: | Glazing system for the building façades | [1997/40] | French: | Système de vitrage pour murs extérieurs de bâtiment | [1995/25] |
Former [1995/25] | Glazing system for the outer building walls | Examination procedure | 24.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/04] | 20.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1563003 (KLEIN) [A] 1* figures 1,2; claims 1,2 * |