EP0646323 - Fat substitute [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.10.2000 [2000/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HERCULES INCORPORATED Hercules Plaza Wilmington Delaware 19894-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/14] | For all designated states HERCULES INCORPORATED Hercules Plaza Wilmington Delaware 19894-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoefler, Andrew Charles 393 Sixth Avenue Parkesburg Pennsylvania 19365 / US | 02 /
Sleap, Julie Ann 50 Patio Road Middletown, N.Y. 10940 / US | 03 /
Trudso, Jens Eskil 175 Surrey Court Ramsey, N.J. 07446 / US | [1995/16] |
Former [1995/14] | 01 /
Hoefler, Andrew Charles 35 Hawthorne Avenue Warwick, N.Y. 10990 / US | ||
02 /
Sleap, Julie Ann 50 Patio Road Middletown, N.Y. 10940 / US | |||
03 /
Trudso, Jens Eskil 175 Surrey Court Ramsey, N.J. 07446 / US | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/14] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94118154.7 | 25.02.1992 | [1995/14] | Priority number, date | US19910661269 | 26.02.1991 Original published format: US 661269 | [1995/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0646323 | Date: | 05.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0646323 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/052, A23L1/308 | [1995/14] | CPC: |
A23G9/34 (EP,US);
A23D9/00 (KR);
A23G3/346 (EP,US);
A23G9/52 (EP,US);
A23L19/115 (EP,US);
A23L23/00 (EP,US);
A23L27/60 (EP,US);
A23L29/231 (EP,US);
A23L29/244 (EP,US);
A23L29/256 (EP,US);
A23L29/269 (EP,US);
A23L29/271 (EP,US);
A23L29/272 (EP,US);
A23L33/17 (EP,US);
A23G2200/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A23G3/346, A23G2200/06 (US,EP);
A23G3/346, A23G2200/08 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/14] | Title | German: | Fett-Ersatz | [1995/14] | English: | Fat substitute | [1995/14] | French: | Substitut de graisses | [1995/14] | Examination procedure | 02.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/31] | 19.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP92301586.1 / EP0501758 | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/42] | Request for further processing for: | 10.11.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 10.11.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.11.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 17.11.1994 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.05.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]WO8912403 (NUTRASWEET CO [US]) [DA] * the whole document *; | [PA]EP0432835 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al); | [PA]WO9113076 (RAFFINERIE TIRLEMONTOISE SA [BE]) |